1 | | - | H.B. No. 2858 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Toth, Romero, Jr. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2858 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to adoption of a uniform swimming pool and spa code for use |
---|
6 | 12 | | in municipalities in this state. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter C, Chapter 214, Local |
---|
9 | 15 | | Government Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | SUBCHAPTER C. SWIMMING POOLS AND SPAS [POOL ENCLOSURES] |
---|
11 | 17 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 214, Local Government |
---|
12 | 18 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 214.103 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 19 | | Sec. 214.103. INTERNATIONAL SWIMMING POOL AND SPA CODE. |
---|
14 | 20 | | (a) In this section, "International Swimming Pool and Spa Code" |
---|
15 | 21 | | means the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code promulgated by |
---|
16 | 22 | | the International Code Council. |
---|
17 | 23 | | (b) To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the |
---|
18 | 24 | | International Swimming Pool and Spa Code, as it existed on May 1, |
---|
19 | 25 | | 2019, is adopted as the municipal swimming pool and spa code in this |
---|
20 | 26 | | state. |
---|
21 | 27 | | (c) The International Swimming Pool and Spa Code applies to |
---|
22 | 28 | | all construction, alteration, remodeling, enlargement, and repair |
---|
23 | 29 | | of swimming pools and spas in a municipality that elects to regulate |
---|
24 | 30 | | pools or spas, including under Section 214.101. |
---|
25 | 31 | | (d) A municipality may establish procedures for: |
---|
26 | 32 | | (1) the adoption of local amendments to the |
---|
27 | 33 | | International Swimming Pool and Spa Code; and |
---|
28 | 34 | | (2) the administration and enforcement of the |
---|
29 | 35 | | International Swimming Pool and Spa Code. |
---|
30 | 36 | | (e) A municipality may review and adopt amendments made by |
---|
31 | 37 | | the International Code Council to the International Swimming Pool |
---|
32 | 38 | | and Spa Code after May 1, 2019. |
---|
33 | | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2020. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2858 was passed by the House on May 9, |
---|
37 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 5, 2 present, not |
---|
38 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
39 | | - | H.B. No. 2858 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
40 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
41 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
42 | | - | on H.B. No. 2858 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, |
---|
43 | | - | Nays 6, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
44 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
46 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2858 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
47 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
48 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
49 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
50 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
51 | | - | 2858 on May 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | __________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 39 | + | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
| 40 | + | * * * * * |
---|