H.B. No. 2858 AN ACT relating to adoption of a uniform swimming pool and spa code for use in municipalities in this state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter C, Chapter 214, Local Government Code, is amended to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER C. SWIMMING POOLS AND SPAS [POOL ENCLOSURES] SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 214, Local Government Code, is amended by adding Section 214.103 to read as follows: Sec. 214.103. INTERNATIONAL SWIMMING POOL AND SPA CODE. (a) In this section, "International Swimming Pool and Spa Code" means the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code promulgated by the International Code Council. (b) To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code, as it existed on May 1, 2019, is adopted as the municipal swimming pool and spa code in this state. (c) The International Swimming Pool and Spa Code applies to all construction, alteration, remodeling, enlargement, and repair of swimming pools and spas in a municipality that elects to regulate pools or spas, including under Section 214.101. (d) A municipality may establish procedures for: (1) the adoption of local amendments to the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code; and (2) the administration and enforcement of the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code. (e) A municipality may review and adopt amendments made by the International Code Council to the International Swimming Pool and Spa Code after May 1, 2019. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2020. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2858 was passed by the House on May 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 5, 2 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2858 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 2858 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 6, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2858 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 2858 on May 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor