|
06/07/2019
|
Effective on 9/1/19
|
|
|
|
06/07/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Record vote RV#465
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Amended 1-Goldman
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|