1 | | - | H.B. No. 2868 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Phelan (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2868 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 5 | + | following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the procurement of interior design services by a |
---|
6 | 12 | | governmental entity. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 2254.002(2), Government Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 15 | | to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (2) "Professional services" means services: |
---|
11 | 17 | | (A) within the scope of the practice, as defined |
---|
12 | 18 | | by state law, of: |
---|
13 | 19 | | (i) accounting; |
---|
14 | 20 | | (ii) architecture; |
---|
15 | 21 | | (iii) landscape architecture; |
---|
16 | 22 | | (iv) land surveying; |
---|
17 | 23 | | (v) medicine; |
---|
18 | 24 | | (vi) optometry; |
---|
19 | 25 | | (vii) professional engineering; |
---|
20 | 26 | | (viii) real estate appraising; or |
---|
21 | 27 | | (ix) professional nursing; [or] |
---|
22 | 28 | | (B) provided in connection with the professional |
---|
23 | 29 | | employment or practice of a person who is licensed or registered as: |
---|
24 | 30 | | (i) a certified public accountant; |
---|
25 | 31 | | (ii) an architect; |
---|
26 | 32 | | (iii) a landscape architect; |
---|
27 | 33 | | (iv) a land surveyor; |
---|
28 | 34 | | (v) a physician, including a surgeon; |
---|
29 | 35 | | (vi) an optometrist; |
---|
30 | 36 | | (vii) a professional engineer; |
---|
31 | 37 | | (viii) a state certified or state licensed |
---|
32 | 38 | | real estate appraiser; or |
---|
33 | 39 | | (ix) a registered nurse; or |
---|
34 | 40 | | (C) provided by a person lawfully engaged in |
---|
35 | 41 | | interior design, regardless of whether the person is registered as |
---|
36 | 42 | | an interior designer under Chapter 1053, Occupations Code. |
---|
37 | 43 | | SECTION 2. Section 2254.002(2), Government Code, as amended |
---|
38 | 44 | | by this Act, applies only to a contract entered into on or after |
---|
39 | 45 | | October 1, 2019. |
---|
40 | 46 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2868 was passed by the House on April |
---|
44 | | - | 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 7, 2 present, not |
---|
45 | | - | voting. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
48 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2868 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
49 | | - | 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 6. |
---|
50 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
52 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Date |
---|
54 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 47 | + | * * * * * |
---|