By: Phelan (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 2868 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the procurement of interior design services by a governmental entity. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 2254.002(2), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (2) "Professional services" means services: (A) within the scope of the practice, as defined by state law, of: (i) accounting; (ii) architecture; (iii) landscape architecture; (iv) land surveying; (v) medicine; (vi) optometry; (vii) professional engineering; (viii) real estate appraising; or (ix) professional nursing; [or] (B) provided in connection with the professional employment or practice of a person who is licensed or registered as: (i) a certified public accountant; (ii) an architect; (iii) a landscape architect; (iv) a land surveyor; (v) a physician, including a surgeon; (vi) an optometrist; (vii) a professional engineer; (viii) a state certified or state licensed real estate appraiser; or (ix) a registered nurse; or (C) provided by a person lawfully engaged in interior design, regardless of whether the person is registered as an interior designer under Chapter 1053, Occupations Code. SECTION 2. Section 2254.002(2), Government Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to a contract entered into on or after October 1, 2019. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *