Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB29 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill May 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 30, 2019