Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB29 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 29
1+By: Minjarez, et al. H.B. No. 29
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Hughes, Menéndez)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2019;
4+ May 13, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
5+ Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
6+ Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.
613 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
714 SECTION 1. Section 453.301, Occupations Code, is amended to
815 read as follows:
916 Sec. 453.301. PRACTICE BY PHYSICAL THERAPIST [TREATING
1017 PATIENT UNDER PRIOR REFERRAL]. (a) A physical therapist may treat
1118 a patient for an injury or condition in a manner described by
1219 Section 453.005 without a [that was the subject of a prior] referral
1320 if the physical therapist:
1421 (1) has been licensed to practice physical therapy for
1522 at least one year;
1623 (2) is covered by professional liability insurance in
1724 the minimum amount required by board rule [notifies the referring
1825 practitioner of the therapy not later than the fifth business day
1926 after the date therapy is begun]; and
2027 (3) either:
2128 (A) possesses a doctoral degree in physical
2229 therapy from:
2330 (i) a program that is accredited by the
2431 Commission on Accreditation in Physical Therapy Education; or
2532 (ii) an institution that is accredited by
2633 an agency or association recognized by the United States secretary
2734 of education; or
2835 (B) has completed at least 30 hours of continuing
2936 competence activities in the area of differential diagnosis.
3037 (a-1) Except as provided by Subsection (a-2), a physical
3138 therapist may treat a patient under Subsection (a) [begins any
3239 episode of treatment before the first anniversary of the referral
3340 by the referring practitioner;
3441 [(4) for physical therapy episodes subsequent to the
3542 episode which was initiated by the referral, treats the patient]
3643 for not more than 10 [20 treatment sessions or 30] consecutive
3744 business [calendar] days[, whichever occurs first ; and
3845 [(5) satisfies any other requirement set by the
3946 board].
4047 (a-2) A physical therapist who possesses a doctoral degree
4148 described by Subsection (a)(3)(A) and has completed a residency or
4249 fellowship may treat a patient under Subsection (a) for not more
4350 than 15 consecutive business days.
4451 (b) The physical therapist must obtain a referral from a
4552 [confer with the] referring practitioner before the physical
4653 therapist may continue treatment that exceeds treatment authorized
4754 under Subsection (a-1) or (a-2), as applicable [(a)(4)].
4855 (c) A physical therapist who treats a patient without a
4956 referral shall obtain from the patient a signed disclosure on a form
5057 prescribed by the board in which the patient acknowledges that:
5158 (1) physical therapy is not a substitute for a medical
5259 diagnosis by a physician;
5360 (2) physical therapy is not based on radiological
5461 imaging;
5562 (3) a physical therapist cannot diagnose an illness or
5663 disease; and
5764 (4) the patient's health insurance may not include
5865 coverage for the physical therapist's services.
5966 SECTION 2. Section 453.351(a), Occupations Code, is amended
6067 to read as follows:
6168 (a) The board may deny a license or suspend or revoke a
6269 license, place a license holder on probation, reprimand a license
6370 holder, impose an administrative penalty, or otherwise discipline a
6471 license holder if the applicant or license holder has:
6572 (1) except as provided by Section [453.301 or]
6673 453.302, provided care [physical therapy] to a person outside the
6774 scope of the physical therapist's practice [without a referral from
6875 a referring practitioner];
6976 (2) used drugs or intoxicating liquors to an extent
7077 that affects the license holder's or applicant's professional
7178 competence;
7279 (3) been convicted of a felony, including a finding or
7380 verdict of guilty, an admission of guilt, or a plea of nolo
7481 contendere, in this state or in any other state or nation;
7582 (4) obtained or attempted to obtain a license by fraud
7683 or deception;
7784 (5) been grossly negligent in the practice of physical
7885 therapy or in acting as a physical therapist assistant;
7986 (6) been found to be mentally incompetent by a court;
8087 (7) practiced physical therapy in a manner detrimental
8188 to the public health and welfare;
8289 (8) had a license to practice physical therapy revoked
8390 or suspended or had other disciplinary action taken against the
8491 license holder or applicant;
8592 (9) had the license holder's or applicant's
8693 application for a license refused, revoked, or suspended by the
8794 proper licensing authority of another state or nation; or
8895 (10) in the case of a physical therapist assistant,
8996 treated a person other than under the direction of a physical
9097 therapist.
9198 SECTION 3. Not later than November 1, 2019, the Texas Board
9299 of Physical Therapy Examiners shall adopt rules necessary to
93100 implement Section 453.301, Occupations Code, as amended by this
94101 Act.
95102 SECTION 4. Section 453.301(c), Occupations Code, as added
96103 by this Act, applies only to treatment by a physical therapist that
97104 is provided on or after November 1, 2019. Treatment that is
98105 provided before November 1, 2019, is governed by the law in effect
99106 on the date the treatment was provided, and the former law is
100107 continued in effect for that purpose.
101108 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
102- ______________________________ ______________________________
103- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
104- I certify that H.B. No. 29 was passed by the House on May 9,
105- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 0, 2 present, not
106- voting.
107- ______________________________
108- Chief Clerk of the House
109- I certify that H.B. No. 29 was passed by the Senate on May 22,
110- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
111- ______________________________
112- Secretary of the Senate
113- APPROVED: _____________________
114- Date
115- _____________________
116- Governor
109+ * * * * *