4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the conveyance of certain state forest land in Cherokee |
---|
6 | 12 | | County under the control of the board of regents of The Texas A&M |
---|
7 | 13 | | University System. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. CONVEYANCE BY THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM. |
---|
10 | 16 | | The board of regents of The Texas A&M University System may convey |
---|
11 | 17 | | the following described real property: |
---|
12 | 18 | | BEING 156.38 acres of land in the G. W. BRASHEAR SURVEY, |
---|
13 | 19 | | ABSTRACT No. 114, CHEROKEE COUNTY, TEXAS, and being all of that |
---|
14 | 20 | | Tract 2 called 158.27 acres from Texas State Hospitals & Special |
---|
15 | 21 | | Schools to Texas Forest Service, Part of Texas Agricultural & |
---|
16 | 22 | | Mechanical College System on September 3, 1963 and recorded in |
---|
17 | 23 | | Volume 541, Page 557 of the Deed Records of Cherokee County, Texas |
---|
18 | 24 | | (hereinafter shown as volume/page, DR, LR for Land Records, OR for |
---|
19 | 25 | | Official Records), and called 156.60 acres in a ReSurvey made by |
---|
20 | 26 | | Frank Speary, RPS No. 777, dated January 17, 1964, but not |
---|
21 | 27 | | recorded: BEARINGS are based on the Texas Coordinate System of |
---|
22 | 28 | | 1983, Texas Central Zone per GPS observations: All coordinates are |
---|
23 | 29 | | U.S. Survey Feet, NAD83(2011) Epoch 2010.000 per Trimble VRS |
---|
24 | 30 | | Network Solutions: At the point of beginning, the angle of |
---|
25 | 31 | | convergence is 02°39'04" and the combined scale factor is 0.9999525: |
---|
26 | 32 | | To get geodetic bearings, rotate the bearings recited herein, |
---|
27 | 33 | | clockwise, by the angle of convergence: All distances are grid and |
---|
28 | 34 | | to get surface distances, divide the distances recited herein by |
---|
29 | 35 | | the combined scale factor: w/cap = a plastic cap marked Affiliated |
---|
30 | 36 | | Surveyors: SEE PLAT: |
---|
31 | 37 | | BEGINNING at a 2" iron pipe found in a fence for the Northeast |
---|
32 | 38 | | comer of said 158.27 acres, the Southeast corner of that 80.00 acres |
---|
33 | 39 | | from Richard & Scott Watson to Rodney Newman on September 21, 2018 |
---|
34 | 40 | | in 2456/559, OR, and in the West line of that Tract 1 called 57.3 |
---|
35 | 41 | | acres S&E 2.00 acres from Billy & Bessie Lankford to Billy & Bessie |
---|
36 | 42 | | Lankford, Trustees on December 31, 2016 in 2360/336, OR, same |
---|
37 | 43 | | having a state plane coordinate with a Northing of 10643943.982 |
---|
38 | 44 | | feet and an Easting of 3895719.774 feet, from which a 1/2" steel rod |
---|
39 | 45 | | w/cap found for an angle point in the East line of said 80.00 acres |
---|
40 | 46 | | and for the Northwest corner of said 57.3 acres is North 02°42'13" |
---|
41 | 47 | | West, 78.10 feet; |
---|
42 | 48 | | THENCE South 03°18'46" East, with the East line of said 158.27 |
---|
43 | 49 | | acres and the West line of said 57.3 acres, 798.11 feet to a 5"x5" |
---|
44 | 50 | | concrete monument found at a x-tie fence corner for the Southwest |
---|
45 | 51 | | corner of said 57.3 acres and the Northwest corner of that 28 1/2 |
---|
46 | 52 | | acres from Billy & Bessie Lankford to Billy & Bessie Lankford, |
---|
47 | 53 | | Trustees on February 16, 2001 in 1488/280, OR; |
---|
48 | 54 | | THENCE South 03°09'00" East, with the East line of said 158.27 |
---|
49 | 55 | | acres and the West line of said 28 1/2 acres, 501.68 feet to a 1/2" |
---|
50 | 56 | | steel rod w/cap set in a pine stump hole for an angle point in the |
---|
51 | 57 | | East line of said 158.87 acres, the Southwest corner of said 28 1/2 |
---|
52 | 58 | | acres and the Northwest corner of that 32 1/2 acres from Billy & |
---|
53 | 59 | | Bessie Lankford to Billy & Bessie Lankford, Trustees on February |
---|
54 | 60 | | 16, 2001 in 1488/274, OR from which a fence corner is South 57°56' |
---|
55 | 61 | | West, 1.70 feet; |
---|
56 | 62 | | THENCE South 03°09'37" East, with the East line of said 158.27 |
---|
57 | 63 | | acres and the West line of said 32 1/2 acres in 1488/274, OR, and the |
---|
58 | 64 | | West line of that 32 1/2 acres from Billy & Bessie Lankford to Billy & |
---|
59 | 65 | | Bessie Lankford, Trustees on February 16, 2001 in 1488/277, OR, |
---|
60 | 66 | | 1389.58 feet to a 2" iron pipe with a pine knot inside and a nail in |
---|
61 | 67 | | the top of said pine knot for the Southeast corner of said 158.27 |
---|
62 | 68 | | acres, the Southwest corner of said 32 1/2 acres in 1488/277, OR, |
---|
63 | 69 | | and in the North line of that tract for 1/2 undivided interest in |
---|
64 | 70 | | 68.00 & 76.328 acres in Family Settlement Agreement from Phillip |
---|
65 | 71 | | Power et al to Phillip Power on June 21, 2005 in 1727/408, OR, with a |
---|
66 | 72 | | reference description for 150 acres from Gertrude Russell to |
---|
67 | 73 | | Winston Power et ux on May 12, 1975 in 685/614, DR; |
---|
68 | 74 | | THENCE South 87°12'02" West, with the South line of said |
---|
69 | 75 | | 158.27 acres, passing the Northwest corner of said 150 acres and the |
---|
70 | 76 | | most Northerly Northeast corner of that 25 acres from Stacy |
---|
71 | 77 | | Southerland to Robert & Wendy Boudreau on December 14, 2011 in |
---|
72 | 78 | | 2093/636, OR, continuing in all 2569.35 feet to a 1/2" steel rod |
---|
73 | 79 | | w/cap set for the Southwest corner of said 158.27 acres, the |
---|
74 | 80 | | Northwest corner of said 25 acres and In the occupied East line of |
---|
75 | 81 | | that Tract 2 called 36 acres from Edna Dickson to Carnie Wilkinson, |
---|
76 | 82 | | Jr. et ux on February 23, 1980 in 790/199, DR, with a reference |
---|
77 | 83 | | description in 107/582, DR, from which the center of a 21" Sweet Gum |
---|
78 | 84 | | fence corner (no marks) is South 82°30' East, 4.3 feet; |
---|
79 | 85 | | THENCE North 02°38'58" West, with the West line of said 158.27 |
---|
80 | 86 | | acres, passing the Northeast comer of said 36 acres and the |
---|
81 | 87 | | Southeast corner of that Tract 2 called 15 acres from Beverly |
---|
82 | 88 | | Parsons to Brenda Thigpen on September 7, 2017 in 2402/106, OR, with |
---|
83 | 89 | | a reference description in 84/376, DR, at 2593.66 feet pass a 1/2" |
---|
84 | 90 | | iron pipe at a 16" fence corner found for the Northeast corner of |
---|
85 | 91 | | said 15 acres and the Southeast corner of that Tract 4 called 4.65 |
---|
86 | 92 | | acres in 2402/106, OR, continuing in all 2647.05 feet to an axle |
---|
87 | 93 | | found in a 2" iron pipe at a x-tie fence corner by a large pointed |
---|
88 | 94 | | rock for the Northwest corner of said 158.27 acres and the Southwest |
---|
89 | 95 | | corner of said 80.00 acres; |
---|
90 | 96 | | THENCE with the common lines of said 80.00 acres and said |
---|
91 | 97 | | 158.27 acres as follows: |
---|
92 | 98 | | North 86°38'39" East, 1255.58 feet to an axle found, from |
---|
93 | 99 | | which found "X" to the center on an 18" Post Oak South 38° West, 4.0 |
---|
94 | 100 | | feet; |
---|
95 | 101 | | North 85°51'47" East, 1288.28 feet to the PLACE OF BEGINNING, |
---|
96 | 102 | | and containing within these calls, 156.36 acres of land. This tract |
---|
97 | 103 | | has no access to a public road. |
---|
98 | 104 | | SECTION 2. INTERESTS CONVEYED. The conveyance authorized |
---|
99 | 105 | | by this Act shall be of fee title to the surface and is exclusive of |
---|
100 | 106 | | all mineral rights. All instruments of conveyance shall be in a |
---|
101 | 107 | | form acceptable to The Texas A&M University System. |
---|
102 | 108 | | SECTION 3. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
103 | 109 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
104 | 110 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
105 | 111 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
106 | 112 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|