Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2963 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/16/2019

                            H.B. No. 2963


 AN ACT
 relating to the conveyance of certain state forest land in Cherokee
 County under the control of the board of regents of The Texas A&M
 University System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  CONVEYANCE BY THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM.
 The board of regents of The Texas A&M University System may convey
 the following described real property:
 BEING 156.38 acres of land in the G. W. BRASHEAR SURVEY,
 ABSTRACT No. 114, CHEROKEE COUNTY, TEXAS, and being all of that
 Tract 2 called 158.27 acres from Texas State Hospitals & Special
 Schools to Texas Forest Service, Part of Texas Agricultural &
 Mechanical College System on September 3, 1963 and recorded in
 Volume 541, Page 557 of the Deed Records of Cherokee County, Texas
 (hereinafter shown as volume/page, DR, LR for Land Records, OR for
 Official Records), and called 156.60 acres in a ReSurvey made by
 Frank Speary, RPS No. 777, dated January 17, 1964, but not
 recorded: BEARINGS are based on the Texas Coordinate System of
 1983, Texas Central Zone per GPS observations: All coordinates are
 U.S. Survey Feet, NAD83(2011) Epoch 2010.000 per Trimble VRS
 Network Solutions: At the point of beginning, the angle of
 convergence is 02°39'04" and the combined scale factor is 0.9999525:
 To get geodetic bearings, rotate the bearings recited herein,
 clockwise, by the angle of convergence: All distances are grid and
 to get surface distances, divide the distances recited herein by
 the combined scale factor: w/cap = a plastic cap marked Affiliated
 Surveyors: SEE PLAT:
 BEGINNING at a 2" iron pipe found in a fence for the Northeast
 comer of said 158.27 acres, the Southeast corner of that 80.00 acres
 from Richard & Scott Watson to Rodney Newman on September 21, 2018
 in 2456/559, OR, and in the West line of that Tract 1 called 57.3
 acres S&E 2.00 acres from Billy & Bessie Lankford to Billy & Bessie
 Lankford, Trustees on December 31, 2016 in 2360/336, OR, same
 having a state plane coordinate with a Northing of 10643943.982
 feet and an Easting of 3895719.774 feet, from which a 1/2" steel rod
 w/cap found for an angle point in the East line of said 80.00 acres
 and for the Northwest corner of said 57.3 acres is North 02°42'13"
 West, 78.10 feet;
 THENCE South 03°18'46" East, with the East line of said 158.27
 acres and the West line of said 57.3 acres, 798.11 feet to a 5"x5"
 concrete monument found at a x-tie fence corner for the Southwest
 corner of said 57.3 acres and the Northwest corner of that 28 1/2
 acres from Billy & Bessie Lankford to Billy & Bessie Lankford,
 Trustees on February 16, 2001 in 1488/280, OR;
 THENCE South 03°09'00" East, with the East line of said 158.27
 acres and the West line of said 28 1/2 acres, 501.68 feet to a 1/2"
 steel rod w/cap set in a pine stump hole for an angle point in the
 East line of said 158.87 acres, the Southwest corner of said 28 1/2
 acres and the Northwest corner of that 32 1/2 acres from Billy &
 Bessie Lankford to Billy & Bessie Lankford, Trustees on February
 16, 2001 in 1488/274, OR from which a fence corner is South 57°56'
 West, 1.70 feet;
 THENCE South 03°09'37" East, with the East line of said 158.27
 acres and the West line of said 32 1/2 acres in 1488/274, OR, and the
 West line of that 32 1/2 acres from Billy & Bessie Lankford to Billy &
 Bessie Lankford, Trustees on February 16, 2001 in 1488/277, OR,
 1389.58 feet to a 2" iron pipe with a pine knot inside and a nail in
 the top of said pine knot for the Southeast corner of said 158.27
 acres, the Southwest corner of said 32 1/2 acres in 1488/277, OR,
 and in the North line of that tract for 1/2 undivided interest in
 68.00 & 76.328 acres in Family Settlement Agreement from Phillip
 Power et al to Phillip Power on June 21, 2005 in 1727/408, OR, with a
 reference description for 150 acres from Gertrude Russell to
 Winston Power et ux on May 12, 1975 in 685/614, DR;
 THENCE South 87°12'02" West, with the South line of said
 158.27 acres, passing the Northwest corner of said 150 acres and the
 most Northerly Northeast corner of that 25 acres from Stacy
 Southerland to Robert & Wendy Boudreau on December 14, 2011 in
 2093/636, OR, continuing in all 2569.35 feet to a 1/2" steel rod
 w/cap set for the Southwest corner of said 158.27 acres, the
 Northwest corner of said 25 acres and In the occupied East line of
 that Tract 2 called 36 acres from Edna Dickson to Carnie Wilkinson,
 Jr. et ux on February 23, 1980 in 790/199, DR, with a reference
 description in 107/582, DR, from which the center of a 21" Sweet Gum
 fence corner (no marks) is South 82°30' East, 4.3 feet;
 THENCE North 02°38'58" West, with the West line of said 158.27
 acres, passing the Northeast comer of said 36 acres and the
 Southeast corner of that Tract 2 called 15 acres from Beverly
 Parsons to Brenda Thigpen on September 7, 2017 in 2402/106, OR, with
 a reference description in 84/376, DR, at 2593.66 feet pass a 1/2"
 iron pipe at a 16" fence corner found for the Northeast corner of
 said 15 acres and the Southeast corner of that Tract 4 called 4.65
 acres in 2402/106, OR, continuing in all 2647.05 feet to an axle
 found in a 2" iron pipe at a x-tie fence corner by a large pointed
 rock for the Northwest corner of said 158.27 acres and the Southwest
 corner of said 80.00 acres;
 THENCE with the common lines of said 80.00 acres and said
 158.27 acres as follows:
 North 86°38'39" East, 1255.58 feet to an axle found, from
 which found "X" to the center on an 18" Post Oak South 38° West, 4.0
 feet;
 North 85°51'47" East, 1288.28 feet to the PLACE OF BEGINNING,
 and containing within these calls, 156.36 acres of land. This tract
 has no access to a public road.
 SECTION 2.  INTERESTS CONVEYED. The conveyance authorized
 by this Act shall be of fee title to the surface and is exclusive of
 all mineral rights. All instruments of conveyance shall be in a
 form acceptable to The Texas A&M University System.
 SECTION 3.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2963 was passed by the House on April
 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2963 was passed by the Senate on May
 15, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED:  _____________________
 Date
 _____________________
 Governor