Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill May 3, 2019