Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3040 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019