Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3040 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3040
1+By: Hunter, Allison, Minjarez H.B. No. 3040
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2019;
4+ May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
5+ Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
6+ Yeas 6, Nays 3; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to an interim study by the Texas Commission on Judicial
613 Selection regarding the method by which certain trial and appellate
714 judges are selected.
815 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
916 SECTION 1. COMMISSION; STUDY. (a) The Texas Commission on
1017 Judicial Selection is established to study and review the method by
1118 which the following judges and justices are selected for office in
1219 this state:
1320 (1) statutory county court judges, including probate
1421 court judges;
1522 (2) district judges;
1623 (3) justices of the courts of appeals;
1724 (4) judges of the court of criminal appeals; and
1825 (5) justices of the supreme court.
1926 (b) The study conducted under this section must consider:
2027 (1) the fairness, effectiveness, and desirability of
2128 selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of this
2229 section through partisan elections;
2330 (2) the fairness, effectiveness, and desirability of
2431 judicial selection methods proposed or adopted by other states;
2532 (3) the relative merits of alternative methods for
2633 selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of this
2734 section, including:
2835 (A) lifetime appointment;
2936 (B) appointment for a term;
3037 (C) appointment for a term, followed by a
3138 partisan election;
3239 (D) appointment for a term, followed by a
3340 nonpartisan election;
3441 (E) appointment for a term, followed by a
3542 nonpartisan retention election;
3643 (F) partisan election for an open seat, followed
3744 by a nonpartisan retention election for incumbents; and
3845 (G) any other method or combination of methods
3946 for selecting a judicial officer described in Subsection (a) of
4047 this section; and
4148 (4) the merits of using a public member board to
4249 nominate or assess the qualifications of candidates for judicial
4350 office.
4451 (c) The Texas Commission on Judicial Selection consists of
4552 15 members appointed as follows:
4653 (1) four members appointed by the governor;
4754 (2) four members appointed by the lieutenant governor,
4855 including three senators, with at least:
4956 (A) one senator who is a member of the political
5057 party with which the lieutenant governor is affiliated; and
5158 (B) one senator who is a member of a political
5259 party other than the political party with which the lieutenant
5360 governor is affiliated;
5461 (3) four members appointed by the speaker of the house
5562 of representatives, including three members of the house of
5663 representatives, with at least:
5764 (A) one representative who is a member of the
5865 political party with which the speaker of the house is affiliated;
5966 and
6067 (B) one representative who is a member of a
6168 political party other than the political party with which the
6269 speaker of the house is affiliated;
6370 (4) one member appointed by the chief justice of the
6471 Supreme Court of Texas;
6572 (5) one member appointed by the presiding judge of the
6673 Texas Court of Criminal Appeals; and
6774 (6) one member appointed by the board of directors of
6875 the State Bar of Texas.
6976 (d) The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
7077 house of representatives shall coordinate to ensure that the
7178 members appointed to the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection
7279 reflect, to the extent practicable, the racial, ethnic, and
7380 geographic diversity of this state and include individuals who are
7481 attorneys and individuals who are not attorneys.
7582 (e) The governor shall designate the presiding officer of
7683 the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection.
7784 (f) The Texas Commission on Judicial Selection shall
7885 convene at the call of the presiding officer.
7986 (g) A member of the Texas Commission on Judicial Selection
8087 is not entitled to compensation but is entitled to reimbursement
8188 for actual and necessary expenses incurred in serving as a member of
8289 the commission.
8390 (h) The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
8491 System shall provide necessary administrative support to the Texas
8592 Commission on Judicial Selection.
8693 (i) Not later than December 31, 2020, the Texas Commission
8794 on Judicial Selection shall submit to the governor and the
8895 legislature a report on the commission's findings and
8996 recommendations on a method or methods for selecting for office
9097 judges listed in Subsection (a) of this section that ensure a fair,
9198 impartial, qualified, competent, and stable judiciary. The
9299 commission shall include in its recommendations specific
93100 constitutional and statutory changes that appear necessary from the
94101 results of the commission's study.
95102 SECTION 2. ABOLITION OF COMMISSION. The Texas Commission
96103 on Judicial Selection is abolished and this Act expires January 2,
97104 2021.
98105 SECTION 3. IMPLEMENTATION TRANSITION. The Office of Court
99106 Administration of the Texas Judicial System is required to
100107 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
101108 appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the
102109 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
103110 purpose, the Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
104111 System may, but is not required to, implement a provision of this
105112 Act using other appropriations available for that purpose.
106113 SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
107114 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
108115 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
109116 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
110117 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
111- ______________________________ ______________________________
112- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
113- I certify that H.B. No. 3040 was passed by the House on May 9,
114- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 122, Nays 11, 2 present, not
115- voting.
116- ______________________________
117- Chief Clerk of the House
118- I certify that H.B. No. 3040 was passed by the Senate on May
119- 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 6.
120- ______________________________
121- Secretary of the Senate
122- APPROVED: _____________________
123- Date
124- _____________________
125- Governor
118+ * * * * *