Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3044 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill April 15, 2019