House | 05/09/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Filed |