Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3084 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill April 12, 2019