Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3091 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019