Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3106 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill April 17, 2019