1 | | - | H.B. No. 3106 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Goldman, et al. H.B. No. 3106 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Huffman, Zaffirini) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal |
---|
| 5 | + | Justice; May 10, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 10, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3106 By: Whitmire |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to a requirement that law enforcement agencies enter into |
---|
6 | 15 | | a certain database information related to investigations of sexual |
---|
7 | 16 | | assault or other sex offenses. |
---|
8 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 18 | | SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as Molly Jane's Law. |
---|
10 | 19 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 420, Government Code, is |
---|
11 | 20 | | amended by adding Section 420.035 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 21 | | Sec. 420.035. DUTY TO ENTER CERTAIN INFORMATION INTO |
---|
13 | 22 | | VIOLENT CRIMINAL APPREHENSION PROGRAM DATABASE. (a) In this |
---|
14 | 23 | | section, "database" means the national database of the Violent |
---|
15 | 24 | | Criminal Apprehension Program established and maintained by the |
---|
16 | 25 | | Federal Bureau of Investigation, or a successor database. |
---|
17 | 26 | | (b) Each law enforcement agency in this state shall request |
---|
18 | 27 | | access from the Federal Bureau of Investigation to enter |
---|
19 | 28 | | information into the database. |
---|
20 | 29 | | (c) A law enforcement agency that investigates a sexual |
---|
21 | 30 | | assault or other sex offense shall enter into the database the |
---|
22 | 31 | | following information regarding the investigation of the sexual |
---|
23 | 32 | | assault or other sex offense, as available: |
---|
24 | 33 | | (1) the suspect's name and date of birth; |
---|
25 | 34 | | (2) the specific offense being investigated; |
---|
26 | 35 | | (3) a description of the manner in which the offense |
---|
27 | 36 | | was committed, including any pattern of conduct occurring during |
---|
28 | 37 | | the course of multiple offenses suspected to have been committed by |
---|
29 | 38 | | the suspect; and |
---|
30 | 39 | | (4) any other information required by the Federal |
---|
31 | 40 | | Bureau of Investigation for inclusion in the database. |
---|
32 | 41 | | (d) Information entered into the database under this |
---|
33 | 42 | | section is excepted from required disclosure under Chapter 552 in |
---|
34 | 43 | | the manner provided by Section 552.108. |
---|
35 | 44 | | SECTION 3. Section 420.035, Government Code, as added by |
---|
36 | 45 | | this Act, applies only to a pending investigation of a sexual |
---|
37 | 46 | | assault or other sex offense, regardless of whether the |
---|
38 | 47 | | investigation was commenced before, on, or after the effective date |
---|
39 | 48 | | of this Act. |
---|
40 | 49 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3106 was passed by the House on April |
---|
44 | | - | 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
45 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
46 | | - | No. 3106 on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 2, |
---|
47 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
50 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3106 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
51 | | - | amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
52 | | - | 0. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
55 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Date |
---|
57 | | - | __________________ |
---|
58 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 50 | + | * * * * * |
---|