1 | 1 | | 86R11133 LED-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: King of Hemphill H.B. No. 3110 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the termination of the Texas Public School Employees |
---|
8 | 8 | | Group Insurance Program for retirees. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 1575, Insurance Code, is amended by |
---|
11 | 11 | | adding Subchapters L and M to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SUBCHAPTER L. TERMINATION OF GROUP PROGRAM |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 1575.551. PROGRAM TERMINATION. Subject to Section |
---|
14 | 14 | | 1575.552, effective September 1, 2019, the group program is |
---|
15 | 15 | | terminated. |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 1575.552. COVERAGE ELIGIBILITY TERMINATES; PHASE-OUT |
---|
17 | 17 | | PERIOD. (a) An individual who is not a participant in the group |
---|
18 | 18 | | program on August 31, 2019, is not entitled to obtain coverage under |
---|
19 | 19 | | the group program after that date. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (b) An individual who is a participant in the group program |
---|
21 | 21 | | on August 31, 2019, and who is, on September 1, 2019, eligible to |
---|
22 | 22 | | participate in Medicare, is not entitled to continue coverage under |
---|
23 | 23 | | the group program after August 31, 2019. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (c) An individual who is a participant in the group program |
---|
25 | 25 | | on August 31, 2019, but who is not, on September 1, 2019, eligible |
---|
26 | 26 | | to participate in Medicare, may continue coverage under the group |
---|
27 | 27 | | program in accordance with this subchapter until the earlier of: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (1) the date the individual first becomes eligible to |
---|
29 | 29 | | participate in Medicare; or |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2) September 1, 2029. |
---|
31 | 31 | | Sec. 1575.553. AUTHORIZED COVERAGE. Notwithstanding |
---|
32 | 32 | | Section 1575.151, on and after September 1, 2019, the group program |
---|
33 | 33 | | may not offer coverage other than health benefit plan coverage. |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sec. 1575.554. EXCESS GROUP INSURANCE FUND MONEY. (a) Not |
---|
35 | 35 | | later than December 31, 2019, the trustee shall determine the |
---|
36 | 36 | | amount of money required to fund coverage for individuals under |
---|
37 | 37 | | Section 1575.552(c) for the 2019-2020 fiscal year and shall certify |
---|
38 | 38 | | that amount to the comptroller. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (b) As soon as practicable after January 1, 2020, the |
---|
40 | 40 | | trustee shall, notwithstanding Section 1575.206, pay to each |
---|
41 | 41 | | retiree participating in the group program on August 31, 2019, an |
---|
42 | 42 | | equal share of the amount by which the money in the group insurance |
---|
43 | 43 | | fund exceeds the amount of money determined under Subsection (a). |
---|
44 | 44 | | Sec. 1575.555. REDUCTION IN CONTRIBUTIONS. (a) Beginning |
---|
45 | 45 | | not later than June 1, 2020, the trustee shall annually determine |
---|
46 | 46 | | the amount of money required to fund coverage for individuals under |
---|
47 | 47 | | Section 1575.552(c) for the subsequent fiscal year. The trustee |
---|
48 | 48 | | shall certify that amount to the comptroller. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (b) The trustee, in consultation with the comptroller, may |
---|
50 | 50 | | annually adjust the amounts of contributions to be made under |
---|
51 | 51 | | Sections 1575.201, 1575.202, 1575.203, and 1575.204, to the extent |
---|
52 | 52 | | that the trustee determines that money otherwise to be contributed |
---|
53 | 53 | | under those sections for a fiscal year will exceed the amount |
---|
54 | 54 | | determined to be required for that fiscal year under Subsection |
---|
55 | 55 | | (a). |
---|
56 | 56 | | Sec. 1575.556. FINAL RECONCILIATION; TERMINATION OF FUND. |
---|
57 | 57 | | As soon as practicable after August 31, 2029, the trustee, in |
---|
58 | 58 | | consultation with the comptroller, shall determine any |
---|
59 | 59 | | unencumbered amount remaining in the group insurance fund. The |
---|
60 | 60 | | trustee shall pay that amount in equal shares to individuals |
---|
61 | 61 | | participating in the program on August 31, 2029. |
---|
62 | 62 | | Sec. 1575.557. GROUP PROGRAM AND GROUP INSURANCE FUND |
---|
63 | 63 | | ABOLISHED. Effective September 1, 2029, the group program and the |
---|
64 | 64 | | group insurance fund are abolished. |
---|
65 | 65 | | Sec. 1575.558. DUTIES OF THE TRUSTEE. (a) The trustee |
---|
66 | 66 | | shall implement a plan for the orderly termination of the group |
---|
67 | 67 | | program in accordance with this subchapter. |
---|
68 | 68 | | (b) The determinations made by the trustee under Sections |
---|
69 | 69 | | 1575.554 and 1575.555 must be actuarially justified. |
---|
70 | 70 | | SUBCHAPTER M. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER |
---|
71 | 71 | | Sec. 1575.601. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires |
---|
72 | 72 | | September 1, 2030. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
74 | 74 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
75 | 75 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
76 | 76 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
77 | 77 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|