Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3110 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/04/2019

                            86R11133 LED-D
 By: King of Hemphill H.B. No. 3110


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the termination of the Texas Public School Employees
 Group Insurance Program for retirees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1575, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapters L and M to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER L. TERMINATION OF GROUP PROGRAM
 Sec. 1575.551.  PROGRAM TERMINATION. Subject to Section
 1575.552, effective September 1, 2019, the group program is
 terminated.
 Sec. 1575.552.  COVERAGE ELIGIBILITY TERMINATES; PHASE-OUT
 PERIOD. (a) An individual who is not a participant in the group
 program on August 31, 2019, is not entitled to obtain coverage under
 the group program after that date.
 (b)  An individual who is a participant in the group program
 on August 31, 2019, and who is, on September 1, 2019, eligible to
 participate in Medicare, is not entitled to continue coverage under
 the group program after August 31, 2019.
 (c)  An individual who is a participant in the group program
 on August 31, 2019, but who is not, on September 1, 2019, eligible
 to participate in Medicare, may continue coverage under the group
 program in accordance with this subchapter until the earlier of:
 (1)  the date the individual first becomes eligible to
 participate in Medicare; or
 (2)  September 1, 2029.
 Sec. 1575.553.  AUTHORIZED COVERAGE. Notwithstanding
 Section 1575.151, on and after September 1, 2019, the group program
 may not offer coverage other than health benefit plan coverage.
 Sec. 1575.554.  EXCESS GROUP INSURANCE FUND MONEY. (a) Not
 later than December 31, 2019, the trustee shall determine the
 amount of money required to fund coverage for individuals under
 Section 1575.552(c) for the 2019-2020 fiscal year and shall certify
 that amount to the comptroller.
 (b)  As soon as practicable after January 1, 2020, the
 trustee shall, notwithstanding Section 1575.206, pay to each
 retiree participating in the group program on August 31, 2019, an
 equal share of the amount by which the money in the group insurance
 fund exceeds the amount of money determined under Subsection (a).
 Sec. 1575.555.  REDUCTION IN CONTRIBUTIONS. (a) Beginning
 not later than June 1, 2020, the trustee shall annually determine
 the amount of money required to fund coverage for individuals under
 Section 1575.552(c) for the subsequent fiscal year. The trustee
 shall certify that amount to the comptroller.
 (b)  The trustee, in consultation with the comptroller, may
 annually adjust the amounts of contributions to be made under
 Sections 1575.201, 1575.202, 1575.203, and 1575.204, to the extent
 that the trustee determines that money otherwise to be contributed
 under those sections for a fiscal year will exceed the amount
 determined to be required for that fiscal year under Subsection
 (a).
 Sec. 1575.556.  FINAL RECONCILIATION; TERMINATION OF FUND.
 As soon as practicable after August 31, 2029, the trustee, in
 consultation with the comptroller, shall determine any
 unencumbered amount remaining in the group insurance fund. The
 trustee shall pay that amount in equal shares to individuals
 participating in the program on August 31, 2029.
 Sec. 1575.557.  GROUP PROGRAM AND GROUP INSURANCE FUND
 ABOLISHED. Effective September 1, 2029, the group program and the
 group insurance fund are abolished.
 Sec. 1575.558.  DUTIES OF THE TRUSTEE. (a) The trustee
 shall implement a plan for the orderly termination of the group
 program in accordance with this subchapter.
 (b)  The determinations made by the trustee under Sections
 1575.554 and 1575.555 must be actuarially justified.
 SUBCHAPTER M. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER
 Sec. 1575.601.  EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires
 September 1, 2030.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.