1 | | - | H.B. No. 3224 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3224 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
| 4 | + | Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
| 6 | + | vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3224 By: Zaffirini |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to a study on the creation of a defense under the Solid |
---|
6 | 14 | | Waste Disposal Act for persons engaged in certain recycling |
---|
7 | 15 | | transactions. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. (a) In this section: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (1) "Commission" means the Texas Commission on |
---|
11 | 19 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
12 | 20 | | (2) "Recyclable material" has the meaning assigned by |
---|
13 | 21 | | 42 U.S.C. Section 9627(b). |
---|
14 | 22 | | (b) The commission, in consultation with industry |
---|
15 | 23 | | stakeholders, shall: |
---|
16 | 24 | | (1) conduct a study on the potential impacts of |
---|
17 | 25 | | creating a defense to liability under Section 361.271(a)(3) or (4), |
---|
18 | 26 | | Health and Safety Code, for persons who arrange for recycling of |
---|
19 | 27 | | recyclable material who would not be liable for the recyclable |
---|
20 | 28 | | material under 42 U.S.C. Section 9607(a)(3) or (4) based on the |
---|
21 | 29 | | person meeting the applicable criteria established under 42 U.S.C. |
---|
22 | 30 | | Section 9627; and |
---|
23 | 31 | | (2) propose legislative recommendations based on the |
---|
24 | 32 | | study. |
---|
25 | 33 | | (c) The commission shall establish a workgroup that |
---|
26 | 34 | | includes industry stakeholders for the purpose of assisting the |
---|
27 | 35 | | commission in proposing legislative recommendations under |
---|
28 | 36 | | Subsection (b)(2) of this section. |
---|
29 | 37 | | (d) Not later than January 15, 2021, the commission shall |
---|
30 | 38 | | submit to the legislature a report on the findings of the study and |
---|
31 | 39 | | legislative recommendations based on the study. |
---|
32 | 40 | | (e) This Act expires August 31, 2021. |
---|
33 | 41 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3224 was passed by the House on April |
---|
37 | | - | 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 3, 2 present, not |
---|
38 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
39 | | - | No. 3224 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 3, |
---|
40 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3224 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
44 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
45 | | - | 0. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Date |
---|
50 | | - | __________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 42 | + | * * * * * |
---|