Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3224 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 3224


 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the creation of a defense under the Solid
 Waste Disposal Act for persons engaged in certain recycling
 transactions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (2)  "Recyclable material" has the meaning assigned by
 42 U.S.C. Section 9627(b).
 (b)  The commission, in consultation with industry
 stakeholders, shall:
 (1)  conduct a study on the potential impacts of
 creating a defense to liability under Section 361.271(a)(3) or (4),
 Health and Safety Code, for persons who arrange for recycling of
 recyclable material who would not be liable for the recyclable
 material under 42 U.S.C. Section 9607(a)(3) or (4) based on the
 person meeting the applicable criteria established under 42 U.S.C.
 Section 9627; and
 (2)  propose legislative recommendations based on the
 study.
 (c)  The commission shall establish a workgroup that
 includes industry stakeholders for the purpose of assisting the
 commission in proposing legislative recommendations under
 Subsection (b)(2) of this section.
 (d)  Not later than January 15, 2021, the commission shall
 submit to the legislature a report on the findings of the study and
 legislative recommendations based on the study.
 (e)  This Act expires August 31, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3224 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 3, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3224 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 3,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3224 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor