Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB330 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill March 12, 2019