1 | | - | H.B. No. 3304 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Raymond, Price (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 3304 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3304 By: Buckingham |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the sunset review of the Texas Health Services |
---|
6 | 14 | | Authority and the repeal of certain provisions affecting the |
---|
7 | 15 | | electronic exchange of health information. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 182, Health and Safety |
---|
10 | 18 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 182.004 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 182.004. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas Health |
---|
12 | 20 | | Services Authority is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code |
---|
13 | 21 | | (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by |
---|
14 | 22 | | that chapter, the corporation is abolished and this section, |
---|
15 | 23 | | Section 182.001, and Subchapters B and C expire September 1, 2027. |
---|
16 | 24 | | SECTION 2. The following provisions of the Health and |
---|
17 | 25 | | Safety Code are repealed: |
---|
18 | 26 | | (1) Section 182.003; |
---|
19 | 27 | | (2) Section 182.052; |
---|
20 | 28 | | (3) Section 182.101(b); |
---|
21 | 29 | | (4) Section 182.102(c); |
---|
22 | 30 | | (5) Section 182.103(d); |
---|
23 | 31 | | (6) Section 182.104(b); |
---|
24 | 32 | | (7) Section 182.105(b); |
---|
25 | 33 | | (8) Section 182.106(b); |
---|
26 | 34 | | (9) Section 182.107(d); and |
---|
27 | 35 | | (10) Section 182.108(f). |
---|
28 | 36 | | SECTION 3. Section 15(b), Chapter 12 (S.B. 203), Acts of the |
---|
29 | 37 | | 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Sections |
---|
30 | 38 | | 182.108(g), (h), (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), and (n), Health and Safety |
---|
31 | 39 | | Code, effective September 1, 2021, is repealed. |
---|
32 | 40 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
35 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3304 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
36 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 4, 2 present, not |
---|
37 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
38 | | - | No. 3304 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 4, |
---|
39 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3304 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
43 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
44 | | - | 0. |
---|
45 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
47 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Date |
---|
49 | | - | __________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 41 | + | * * * * * |
---|