Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3304 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 3304


 AN ACT
 relating to the sunset review of the Texas Health Services
 Authority and the repeal of certain provisions affecting the
 electronic exchange of health information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 182, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 182.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 182.004.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas Health
 Services Authority is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code
 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by
 that chapter, the corporation is abolished and this section,
 Section 182.001, and Subchapters B and C expire September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  The following provisions of the Health and
 Safety Code are repealed:
 (1)  Section 182.003;
 (2)  Section 182.052;
 (3)  Section 182.101(b);
 (4)  Section 182.102(c);
 (5)  Section 182.103(d);
 (6)  Section 182.104(b);
 (7)  Section 182.105(b);
 (8)  Section 182.106(b);
 (9)  Section 182.107(d); and
 (10)  Section 182.108(f).
 SECTION 3.  Section 15(b), Chapter 12 (S.B. 203), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Sections
 182.108(g), (h), (i), (j), (k), (l), (m), and (n), Health and Safety
 Code, effective September 1, 2021, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3304 was passed by the House on May 7,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 4, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3304 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 137, Nays 4,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3304 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor