Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3463 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019