Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3489 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2019

                            86R13091 JES-F
 By: Cole H.B. No. 3489


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a task force on sex-based
 harassment in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 37, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 37.0834 to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.0834.  TASK FORCE ON SEX-BASED HARASSMENT IN
 SCHOOLS. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Sex-based harassment" includes "dating
 violence," "sexual assault," "sexual harassment," and "stalking,"
 as those terms are defined in Section 51.9365.
 (2)  "Task force" means the task force on sex-based
 harassment in public schools established under this section.
 (3)  "Title IX" means Title IX of the Education
 Amendments of 1972 (20 U.S.C. Section 1681 et seq.).
 (b)  The agency shall establish a task force on sex-based
 harassment in public schools to evaluate and provide
 recommendations on:
 (1)  the prevalence of incidents of sex-based
 harassment against students on campuses of public schools;
 (2)  current federal, state, and local laws and rules
 related to sex-based harassment;
 (3)  the barriers to creation and implementation of
 policies, procedures, and programs to prevent sex-based harassment
 in public schools;
 (4)  strategies for collecting data on the prevalence
 of sex-based harassment and the response by public schools to
 incidents of sex-based harassment;
 (5)  best practices for the agency to provide guidance
 and support to public schools regarding sex-based harassment;
 (6)  best practices for public schools providing
 guidance and support to students regarding sex-based harassment;
 and
 (7)  any other issues identified by the task force
 related to sex-based harassment in public schools.
 (c)  The task force is composed of 15 members appointed by
 the commissioner. The commissioner shall appoint:
 (1)  two members who represent nonprofit organizations
 that focus on mental health or trauma;
 (2)  one member who represents a nonprofit organization
 that focuses on youth;
 (3)  two members who represent legal advocacy nonprofit
 organizations;
 (4)  three members who represent nonprofit
 organizations that focus on gender-based or interpersonal
 violence;
 (5)  one member who represents a nonprofit organization
 that focuses on schools;
 (6)  two members who are school district employees or
 members of a local school health advisory council;
 (7)  one member who has served as a Title IX coordinator
 at a school district or an institution of higher education;
 (8)  one parent or guardian of a student enrolled in a
 public school in this state;
 (9)  one member of the public who is under 25 years of
 age; and
 (10)  one member who is an agency employee.
 (d)  The commissioner shall select one member to serve as the
 presiding officer of the task force.
 (e)  Members of the task force serve at the will of the
 commissioner. A vacancy on the task force must be filled in the same
 manner as the original appointment.
 (f)  The task force shall meet at least four times at the call
 of the presiding officer and at any other times determined by the
 presiding officer.
 (g)  A task force member is not entitled to compensation for
 service on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement for
 actual and necessary expenses incurred in performing task force
 duties. The task force may accept gifts, grants, and donations to
 pay for those expenses.
 (h)  In determining best practices for public schools, the
 task force must evaluate and provide recommendations related to:
 (1)  improving student and parent or guardian awareness
 of school policies and student rights, including awareness of:
 (A)  how to access information about a school
 district's sex-based harassment policy;
 (B)  how to report sex-based harassment,
 including how to contact a school district's Title IX coordinator;
 (C)  investigation procedures and associated
 rights and policies for the accused and complainant in sex-based
 harassment incidents;
 (D)  counseling and mental health services
 available on campus or by referral to off-campus resources for
 students who experience sex-based harassment; and
 (E)  accommodations available to support students
 who experience sex-based harassment; and
 (2)  school district policies and procedures,
 including:
 (A)  providing information to students,
 guardians, school employees, and members of the public in languages
 prevalent in the school district on the district's sex-based
 harassment policies and procedures and contact information for each
 school's Title IX coordinator;
 (B)  professional development training for school
 district employees that includes:
 (i)  training in trauma-informed practices;
 (ii)  information relating to the contents
 of Title IX regarding sex-based harassment;
 (iii)  reporting and investigation
 procedures, including the referral of a student or parent or
 guardian to the Title IX coordinator; and
 (iv)  any other training relevant to the
 implementation of Title IX in public schools;
 (C)  hearing procedures for ensuring due process
 for a person who experiences sex-based harassment and a person
 accused of sex-based harassment;
 (D)  providing trauma-informed counseling or
 mental health services on public school campuses or referring
 students to off-campus mental health services;
 (E)  enabling public schools to evaluate the need
 for and provide necessary academic or other accommodations to
 students affected by sex-based harassment; and
 (F)  any other issues identified by the task force
 regarding sex-based harassment and the implementation of Title IX
 in public schools.
 (i)  The agency, using existing resources, shall provide
 administrative support for the task force.
 (j)  Not later than August 31, 2020, the task force shall
 submit a written report to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 the speaker of the house of representatives, and the commissioner
 that includes the task force's findings and recommendations,
 including any recommended changes to state law.
 (k)  The task force is abolished and this section expires on
 June 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2019, the
 commissioner of education shall appoint the members of the task
 force established under Section 37.0834, Education Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.