|
06/15/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/25/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Record vote RV#1233
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Gutierrez
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Record vote RV#1164
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|