Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3616 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/07/2019

                    By: Hunter H.B. No. 3616


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a task force on faith-based programs that provide
 assistance during a disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 418.054 to read as follows:
 Section 418.054.  TASK FORCE ON FAITH-BASED DISASTER
 RESPONSE.  (a)  The task force on faith-based disaster response is
 established to assist the division in fulfilling the division's
 duties under Section 418.043, Government Code.  The division shall
 provide administrative support to the task force.
 (b)  The task force is composed of representatives of
 faith-based organizations active in disaster appointed by the chief
 of the division.  The chief may appoint as many task force members
 as are optimal to ensure effective representation of faith-based
 organizations active in disaster response.
 (c)  The chief is designated as the interim presiding officer
 for purposes of calling and conducting the initial meeting of the
 task force.  The task force shall at its initial meeting select a
 presiding officer from among its members for the purpose of calling
 and conducting meetings, and may select an assistant presiding
 officer and a secretary from among its members.  A member of the
 task force may not receive compensation or reimbursement for
 service on the task force.
 (d)  After its initial meeting, the task force shall meet at
 least twice each year at a time and place determined by the
 presiding officer.  The task force may meet at other times the task
 force considers appropriate.  The presiding officer may call a
 meeting on the officer's own motion.  The task force may meet by
 teleconference.
 (e)  The task force shall:
 (1)  develop and implement a plan for improving data
 collection regarding faith-based organizations that participate in
 disaster relief;
 (2)  develop best practices for communicating,
 cooperating, and collaborating with faith-based organizations to
 strengthen disaster response in this state;
 (3)  identify and address inefficiencies in disaster
 relief provided by the state and faith-based organizations; and
 (4)  identify and address gaps in state services that
 faith-based organizations could fill.
 (f)  The task force shall prepare a report and may include
 recommendations relating to legislation or administrative actions
 necessary to address an issue identified by the task force related
 to the participation of faith-based organizations in disaster
 relief.  The task force shall present the report to the Legislature
 and Governor not later than December 1, 2020.
 (g)  The task force may solicit, accept, and administer
 gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private source.
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than October 1, 2019, the chief of the
 Texas Division of Emergency Management shall appoint members to the
 task force on faith-based disaster response in accordance with
 Section 416.054, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.