Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3616 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3616
1+By: Hunter, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3616
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
3+ May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water &
4+ Rural Affairs; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the establishment of a task force on faith-based
612 programs that provide assistance during a disaster.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by
915 adding Subchapter I to read as follows:
10- SUBCHAPTER I. TASK FORCE ON FAITH-B
11- ASED DISASTER RESPONSE
16+ SUBCHAPTER I. TASK FORCE ON FAITH-BASED DISASTER RESPONSE
1217 Sec. 418.251. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
1318 (1) "Chief" means the chief of the division appointed
1419 under Section 418.041.
1520 (2) "Task force" means the task force on faith-based
1621 disaster response established under this subchapter.
1722 Sec. 418.252. ESTABLISHMENT. The task force on faith-based
1823 disaster response is established to assist the division by studying
1924 the participation of faith-based organizations in disaster
2025 response.
2126 Sec. 418.253. MEMBERSHIP. (a) The task force is composed
2227 of representatives of faith-based organizations active in disaster
2328 response appointed by the chief.
2429 (b) The chief shall determine the number of members of the
2530 task force to ensure effective representation of faith-based
2631 organizations active in disaster response.
2732 Sec. 418.254. OFFICERS. (a) The chief is designated as the
2833 interim presiding officer for purposes of calling and conducting
2934 the initial meeting of the task force.
3035 (b) The task force:
3136 (1) shall at its initial meeting select a presiding
3237 officer from among its members for the purpose of calling and
3338 conducting meetings; and
3439 (2) may select an assistant presiding officer and
3540 secretary from among its members.
3641 Sec. 418.255. COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT. A member of the
3742 task force is not entitled to compensation or reimbursement of
3843 expenses for service on the task force.
3944 Sec. 418.256. MEETINGS. (a) After its initial meeting, the
4045 task force shall meet at least twice each year at a time and place
4146 determined by the presiding officer.
4247 (b) The task force may meet at other times the task force
4348 considers appropriate. The presiding officer may call a meeting on
4449 the officer's own motion.
4550 (c) The task force may meet by teleconference.
4651 Sec. 418.257. ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The division shall
4752 provide administrative support to the task force.
4853 Sec. 418.258. DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall:
4954 (1) develop and implement a plan for improving data
5055 collection regarding faith-based organizations that participate in
5156 disaster response;
5257 (2) develop best practices for communicating,
5358 cooperating, and collaborating with faith-based organizations to
5459 strengthen disaster response in this state;
5560 (3) identify and address inefficiencies in disaster
5661 response provided by the state and faith-based organizations; and
5762 (4) identify and address gaps in state services that
5863 could be provided by faith-based organizations.
5964 Sec. 418.259. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2020, the
6065 task force shall submit to the governor and the legislature a report
6166 of the task force's activities conducted under Section 418.258 and
6267 any recommendations for legislative or other action.
6368 Sec. 418.260. GIFTS AND GRANTS. The task force may solicit
6469 and accept gifts and grants from any source to be used to carry out a
6570 function of the task force.
6671 Sec. 418.261. EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and
6772 this subchapter expires September 1, 2021.
6873 SECTION 2. Not later than October 1, 2019, the chief of the
6974 Texas Division of Emergency Management shall appoint members to the
7075 task force on faith-based disaster response, as required by Section
7176 418.253, Government Code, as added by this Act.
7277 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7378 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7479 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7580 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7681 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
77- ______________________________ ______________________________
78- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
79- I certify that H.B. No. 3616 was passed by the House on May 3,
80- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
81- voting.
82- ______________________________
83- Chief Clerk of the House
84- I certify that H.B. No. 3616 was passed by the Senate on May
85- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
86- ______________________________
87- Secretary of the Senate
88- APPROVED: _____________________
89- Date
90- _____________________
91- Governor
82+ * * * * *