Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3616 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            H.B. No. 3616


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a task force on faith-based
 programs that provide assistance during a disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter I to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER I. TASK FORCE ON FAITH-B
 ASED DISASTER RESPONSE
 Sec. 418.251.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Chief" means the chief of the division appointed
 under Section 418.041.
 (2)  "Task force" means the task force on faith-based
 disaster response established under this subchapter.
 Sec. 418.252.  ESTABLISHMENT. The task force on faith-based
 disaster response is established to assist the division by studying
 the participation of faith-based organizations in disaster
 response.
 Sec. 418.253.  MEMBERSHIP. (a)  The task force is composed
 of representatives of faith-based organizations active in disaster
 response appointed by the chief.
 (b)  The chief shall determine the number of members of the
 task force to ensure effective representation of faith-based
 organizations active in disaster response.
 Sec. 418.254.  OFFICERS. (a)  The chief is designated as the
 interim presiding officer for purposes of calling and conducting
 the initial meeting of the task force.
 (b)  The task force:
 (1)  shall at its initial meeting select a presiding
 officer from among its members for the purpose of calling and
 conducting meetings; and
 (2)  may select an assistant presiding officer and
 secretary from among its members.
 Sec. 418.255.  COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT.  A member of the
 task force is not entitled to compensation or reimbursement of
 expenses for service on the task force.
 Sec. 418.256.  MEETINGS. (a)  After its initial meeting, the
 task force shall meet at least twice each year at a time and place
 determined by the presiding officer.
 (b)  The task force may meet at other times the task force
 considers appropriate. The presiding officer may call a meeting on
 the officer's own motion.
 (c)  The task force may meet by teleconference.
 Sec. 418.257.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The division shall
 provide administrative support to the task force.
 Sec. 418.258.  DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall:
 (1)  develop and implement a plan for improving data
 collection regarding faith-based organizations that participate in
 disaster response;
 (2)  develop best practices for communicating,
 cooperating, and collaborating with faith-based organizations to
 strengthen disaster response in this state;
 (3)  identify and address inefficiencies in disaster
 response provided by the state and faith-based organizations; and
 (4)  identify and address gaps in state services that
 could be provided by faith-based organizations.
 Sec. 418.259.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2020, the
 task force shall submit to the governor and the legislature a report
 of the task force's activities conducted under Section 418.258 and
 any recommendations for legislative or other action.
 Sec. 418.260.  GIFTS AND GRANTS. The task force may solicit
 and accept gifts and grants from any source to be used to carry out a
 function of the task force.
 Sec. 418.261.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and
 this subchapter expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than October 1, 2019, the chief of the
 Texas Division of Emergency Management shall appoint members to the
 task force on faith-based disaster response, as required by Section
 418.253, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3616 was passed by the House on May 3,
 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3616 was passed by the Senate on May
 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED:  _____________________
 Date
 _____________________
 Governor