H.B. No. 3616 AN ACT relating to the establishment of a task force on faith-based programs that provide assistance during a disaster. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by adding Subchapter I to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER I. TASK FORCE ON FAITH-B ASED DISASTER RESPONSE Sec. 418.251. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: (1) "Chief" means the chief of the division appointed under Section 418.041. (2) "Task force" means the task force on faith-based disaster response established under this subchapter. Sec. 418.252. ESTABLISHMENT. The task force on faith-based disaster response is established to assist the division by studying the participation of faith-based organizations in disaster response. Sec. 418.253. MEMBERSHIP. (a) The task force is composed of representatives of faith-based organizations active in disaster response appointed by the chief. (b) The chief shall determine the number of members of the task force to ensure effective representation of faith-based organizations active in disaster response. Sec. 418.254. OFFICERS. (a) The chief is designated as the interim presiding officer for purposes of calling and conducting the initial meeting of the task force. (b) The task force: (1) shall at its initial meeting select a presiding officer from among its members for the purpose of calling and conducting meetings; and (2) may select an assistant presiding officer and secretary from among its members. Sec. 418.255. COMPENSATION; REIMBURSEMENT. A member of the task force is not entitled to compensation or reimbursement of expenses for service on the task force. Sec. 418.256. MEETINGS. (a) After its initial meeting, the task force shall meet at least twice each year at a time and place determined by the presiding officer. (b) The task force may meet at other times the task force considers appropriate. The presiding officer may call a meeting on the officer's own motion. (c) The task force may meet by teleconference. Sec. 418.257. ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. The division shall provide administrative support to the task force. Sec. 418.258. DUTIES OF TASK FORCE. The task force shall: (1) develop and implement a plan for improving data collection regarding faith-based organizations that participate in disaster response; (2) develop best practices for communicating, cooperating, and collaborating with faith-based organizations to strengthen disaster response in this state; (3) identify and address inefficiencies in disaster response provided by the state and faith-based organizations; and (4) identify and address gaps in state services that could be provided by faith-based organizations. Sec. 418.259. REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2020, the task force shall submit to the governor and the legislature a report of the task force's activities conducted under Section 418.258 and any recommendations for legislative or other action. Sec. 418.260. GIFTS AND GRANTS. The task force may solicit and accept gifts and grants from any source to be used to carry out a function of the task force. Sec. 418.261. EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this subchapter expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. Not later than October 1, 2019, the chief of the Texas Division of Emergency Management shall appoint members to the task force on faith-based disaster response, as required by Section 418.253, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3616 was passed by the House on May 3, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3616 was passed by the Senate on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor