Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3635 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019