Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019