1 | | - | H.B. No. 3842 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3842 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Administration; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | | - | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 501, Transportation Code, |
---|
9 | | - | is amended by adding Section 501.0236 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | | - | Sec. 501.0236. ISSUANCE OF TITLE AND PERMITS WHEN DEALER |
---|
11 | | - | GOES OUT OF BUSINESS. (a) This section applies only to a person who |
---|
12 | | - | is the purchaser of a motor vehicle for which the dealer: |
---|
13 | | - | (1) is required to apply for a title for the vehicle |
---|
14 | | - | under Section 501.0234; and |
---|
15 | | - | (2) does not apply for the title because the dealer has |
---|
16 | | - | gone out of business. |
---|
17 | | - | (b) A purchaser to whom this section applies may apply for: |
---|
18 | | - | (1) a title in the manner prescribed by the department |
---|
19 | | - | by rule; and |
---|
20 | | - | (2) on expiration of the buyer's tag issued to the |
---|
21 | | - | purchaser under Section 503.063, a 30-day permit under Section |
---|
22 | | - | 502.095. |
---|
23 | | - | (c) An application for a title under this section must |
---|
24 | | - | include a release of any recorded lien on the motor vehicle unless |
---|
25 | | - | the only recorded lienholder is a dealer described by Subsection |
---|
26 | | - | (a). |
---|
27 | | - | (d) The department shall waive the payment of fees for: |
---|
28 | | - | (1) a title issued to a purchaser described by this |
---|
29 | | - | section, if the purchaser can show that fees for a title were paid |
---|
30 | | - | to the dealer; and |
---|
31 | | - | (2) one 30-day permit issued to a purchaser described |
---|
32 | | - | by this section. |
---|
33 | | - | (e) Notwithstanding Section 503.033(e), the department may |
---|
34 | | - | recover against the surety bond executed by the dealer under |
---|
35 | | - | Section 503.033 the amount of any fee waived for a title or permit |
---|
36 | | - | issued under this section. |
---|
37 | | - | (f) The department shall adopt the rules necessary to |
---|
38 | | - | implement this section. |
---|
39 | | - | SECTION 2. Section 503.027(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
| 14 | + | SECTION 1. Section 503.027(a), Transportation Code, is |
---|
47 | | - | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
50 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3842 was passed by the House on April |
---|
51 | | - | 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 15, 1 present, not |
---|
52 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
53 | | - | H.B. No. 3842 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
54 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
55 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
56 | | - | on H.B. No. 3842 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 128, |
---|
57 | | - | Nays 14, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
60 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3842 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
61 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays |
---|
62 | | - | 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
63 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
64 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
65 | | - | 3842 on May 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1. |
---|
66 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
68 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Date |
---|
70 | | - | __________________ |
---|
71 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 22 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
| 23 | + | * * * * * |
---|