Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3842 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            H.B. No. 3842


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of certain motor vehicle dealers;
 waiving certain fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 501, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 501.0236 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.0236.  ISSUANCE OF TITLE AND PERMITS WHEN DEALER
 GOES OUT OF BUSINESS. (a) This section applies only to a person who
 is the purchaser of a motor vehicle for which the dealer:
 (1)  is required to apply for a title for the vehicle
 under Section 501.0234; and
 (2)  does not apply for the title because the dealer has
 gone out of business.
 (b)  A purchaser to whom this section applies may apply for:
 (1)  a title in the manner prescribed by the department
 by rule; and
 (2)  on expiration of the buyer's tag issued to the
 purchaser under Section 503.063, a 30-day permit under Section
 502.095.
 (c)  An application for a title under this section must
 include a release of any recorded lien on the motor vehicle unless
 the only recorded lienholder is a dealer described by Subsection
 (a).
 (d)  The department shall waive the payment of fees for:
 (1)  a title issued to a purchaser described by this
 section, if the purchaser can show that fees for a title were paid
 to the dealer; and
 (2)  one 30-day permit issued to a purchaser described
 by this section.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Section 503.033(e), the department may
 recover against the surety bond executed by the dealer under
 Section 503.033 the amount of any fee waived for a title or permit
 issued under this section.
 (f)  The department shall adopt the rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 503.027(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A [If a dealer consigns for sale more than five vehicles
 in a calendar year from a location other than the location for which
 the dealer holds a general distinguishing number, the] dealer must
 [also] hold a general distinguishing number for a [the] consignment
 location unless the consignment location is a wholesale motor
 vehicle auction.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3842 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 131, Nays 15, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3842 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3842 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 128,
 Nays 14, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3842 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays
 4; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3842 on May 25, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor