By: Capriglione (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3875 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019; April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3875 By: Zaffirini A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to cloud compatibility of certain state agency information technology purchases. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. The heading to Section 2157.007, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 2157.007. [CONSIDERATION OF] CLOUD COMPUTING SERVICE [PURCHASE]. SECTION 2. Section 2157.007, Government Code, is amended by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows: (a) In this section: (1) "Cloud computing service" has the meaning assigned by Special Publication 800-145 issued by the United States Department of Commerce National Institute of Standards and Technology, as the definition existed on January 1, 2015. (2) "Major information resources project" has the meaning assigned by Section 2054.003. (b) Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), a [A] state agency shall ensure [consider cloud computing service options, including any security benefits and cost savings associated with purchasing those service options from a cloud computing service provider and from a statewide technology center established by the department], when making purchases for an automated information system or a major information resources project, that the system or project is capable of being deployed and run on cloud computing services [under Section 2054.118]. (b-1) When making a purchase for an automated information system or a major information resources project, a state agency may determine that, due to integration limitations with legacy systems, security risks, or costs, the agency is unable to purchase a system or project capable of being deployed and run on cloud computing services. (b-2) At least 14 days before the date a state agency solicits bids, proposals, offers, or other applicable expressions of interest for a purchase described by Subsection (b-1), the agency shall submit to the Legislative Budget Board for the purchase of an automated information system or to the quality assurance team as defined by Section 2054.003 for the purchase of a major information resources project a report that describes the purchase and the agency's reasoning for making the purchase. SECTION 3. Section 2157.007, Government Code, as amended by this Act, applies only with respect to a purchase made by a state agency on or after the effective date of this Act. A purchase made before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the purchase was made, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *