Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3875 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/25/2019

                            H.B. No. 3875


 AN ACT
 relating to cloud compatibility of certain state agency information
 technology purchases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 2157.007, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2157.007.  [CONSIDERATION OF] CLOUD COMPUTING SERVICE
 [PURCHASE].
 SECTION 2.  Section 2157.007, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (b-1) and
 (b-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Cloud computing service" has the meaning assigned
 by Special Publication 800-145 issued by the United States
 Department of Commerce National Institute of Standards and
 Technology, as the definition existed on January 1, 2015.
 (2)  "Major information resources project" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 2054.003.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), a [A] state
 agency shall ensure [consider cloud computing service options,
 including any security benefits and cost savings associated with
 purchasing those service options from a cloud computing service
 provider and from a statewide technology center established by the
 department], when making purchases for an automated information
 system or a major information resources project, that the system or
 project is capable of being deployed and run on cloud computing
 services [under Section 2054.118].
 (b-1)  When making a purchase for an automated information
 system or a major information resources project, a state agency may
 determine that, due to integration limitations with legacy systems,
 security risks, or costs, the agency is unable to purchase a system
 or project capable of being deployed and run on cloud computing
 services.
 (b-2)  At least 14 days before the date a state agency
 solicits bids, proposals, offers, or other applicable expressions
 of interest for a purchase described by Subsection (b-1), the
 agency shall submit to the Legislative Budget Board for the
 purchase of an automated information system or to the quality
 assurance team as defined by Section 2054.003 for the purchase of a
 major information resources project a report that describes the
 purchase and the agency's reasoning for making the purchase.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2157.007, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only with respect to a purchase made by a state
 agency on or after the effective date of this Act. A purchase made
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the purchase was made, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3875 was passed by the House on April
 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3875 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3875 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor