1 | | - | H.B. No. 3875 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Capriglione (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3875 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3875 By: Zaffirini |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to cloud compatibility of certain state agency information |
---|
6 | 14 | | technology purchases. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 2157.007, Government |
---|
9 | 17 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 2157.007. [CONSIDERATION OF] CLOUD COMPUTING SERVICE |
---|
11 | 19 | | [PURCHASE]. |
---|
12 | 20 | | SECTION 2. Section 2157.007, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
13 | 21 | | amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (b-1) and |
---|
14 | 22 | | (b-2) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (a) In this section: |
---|
16 | 24 | | (1) "Cloud computing service" has the meaning assigned |
---|
17 | 25 | | by Special Publication 800-145 issued by the United States |
---|
18 | 26 | | Department of Commerce National Institute of Standards and |
---|
19 | 27 | | Technology, as the definition existed on January 1, 2015. |
---|
20 | 28 | | (2) "Major information resources project" has the |
---|
21 | 29 | | meaning assigned by Section 2054.003. |
---|
22 | 30 | | (b) Except as provided by Subsection (b-1), a [A] state |
---|
23 | 31 | | agency shall ensure [consider cloud computing service options, |
---|
24 | 32 | | including any security benefits and cost savings associated with |
---|
25 | 33 | | purchasing those service options from a cloud computing service |
---|
26 | 34 | | provider and from a statewide technology center established by the |
---|
27 | 35 | | department], when making purchases for an automated information |
---|
28 | 36 | | system or a major information resources project, that the system or |
---|
29 | 37 | | project is capable of being deployed and run on cloud computing |
---|
30 | 38 | | services [under Section 2054.118]. |
---|
31 | 39 | | (b-1) When making a purchase for an automated information |
---|
32 | 40 | | system or a major information resources project, a state agency may |
---|
33 | 41 | | determine that, due to integration limitations with legacy systems, |
---|
34 | 42 | | security risks, or costs, the agency is unable to purchase a system |
---|
35 | 43 | | or project capable of being deployed and run on cloud computing |
---|
36 | 44 | | services. |
---|
37 | 45 | | (b-2) At least 14 days before the date a state agency |
---|
38 | 46 | | solicits bids, proposals, offers, or other applicable expressions |
---|
39 | 47 | | of interest for a purchase described by Subsection (b-1), the |
---|
40 | 48 | | agency shall submit to the Legislative Budget Board for the |
---|
41 | 49 | | purchase of an automated information system or to the quality |
---|
42 | 50 | | assurance team as defined by Section 2054.003 for the purchase of a |
---|
43 | 51 | | major information resources project a report that describes the |
---|
44 | 52 | | purchase and the agency's reasoning for making the purchase. |
---|
45 | 53 | | SECTION 3. Section 2157.007, Government Code, as amended by |
---|
46 | 54 | | this Act, applies only with respect to a purchase made by a state |
---|
47 | 55 | | agency on or after the effective date of this Act. A purchase made |
---|
48 | 56 | | before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in |
---|
49 | 57 | | effect on the date the purchase was made, and the former law is |
---|
50 | 58 | | continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
51 | 59 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
54 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3875 was passed by the House on April |
---|
55 | | - | 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
56 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
57 | | - | No. 3875 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, |
---|
58 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
61 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3875 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
62 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
63 | | - | 0. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
66 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Date |
---|
68 | | - | __________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 60 | + | * * * * * |
---|