Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3876 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-86R28751 MCK-F
1+86R13669 MCK-F
22 By: Deshotel H.B. No. 3876
3- Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3876:
4- By: Romero, Jr. C.S.H.B. No. 3876
53
64
75 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
86 AN ACT
97 relating to the creation of a work group to advise the Texas
108 Workforce Commission regarding the Texas Rising Star Program.
119 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1210 SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
1311 amended by adding Section 2308.321 to read as follows:
1412 Sec. 2308.321. TEXAS RISING STAR PROGRAM REVIEW WORK GROUP.
1513 (a) The Texas Rising Star Program review work group is established
1614 to propose revisions to the commission's rules on the Texas Rising
1715 Star Program.
1816 (b) The work group consists of the following members
1917 appointed by the executive director of the commission:
2018 (1) at least one member from the commission;
21- (2) at least one member from the Health and Human
22- Services Commission;
19+ (2) at least one member from the Department of Family
20+ and Protective Services;
2321 (3) at least one member from the early childhood
2422 education division of the Texas Education Agency;
2523 (4) at least one member from the governor's Texas Early
2624 Learning Council;
2725 (5) at least one member who is appointed to a local
2826 workforce development board;
2927 (6) at least four members who are Texas Rising Star
3028 Program providers with different Texas Rising Star Program ratings:
3129 (A) at least one of whom must be a for-profit
3230 private provider;
3331 (B) at least one of whom must be a single-site
3432 provider;
3533 (C) at least one of whom must be a multi-site
3634 provider; and
3735 (D) at least one of whom must be an individual who
3836 provides child care in the provider's own home;
3937 (7) at least one provider who is a Texas School Ready!
4038 participant;
4139 (8) at least three members employed by different
4240 boards who work in the employing board's child-care program and
4341 have experience and expertise in early childhood development or the
4442 Texas Rising Star Program or other similar certification or
4543 accreditation programs; and
4644 (9) not more than three public members who are
4745 ineligible for appointment to the work group under Subdivisions
4846 (1)-(8) and whom the executive director considers indispensable to
4947 work group purposes.
5048 (c) The work group shall hold the group's initial meeting
5149 not later than November 1, 2019, and shall meet at other times as
5250 determined by the presiding officer.
5351 (d) The work group shall elect a presiding officer by a vote
5452 of the membership of the work group.
5553 (e) Not later than May 1, 2020, the work group shall submit
5654 to the executive director of the commission recommendations
5755 proposing revisions to the commission's guidelines relating to the
5856 Texas Rising Star Program. In making its recommendations, the work
5957 group shall consider:
6058 (1) professional development standards for child-care
6159 directors and employees, including training and annual
6260 professional development requirements;
6361 (2) education and experience requirements for mentors
6462 and evaluators;
6563 (3) early learning and school readiness standards;
6664 (4) guidelines for infants and toddlers in child care;
6765 (5) minimum training hours for providers;
6866 (6) playground standards, including outdoor learning
6967 environments;
7068 (7) nutrition standards;
7169 (8) standards for use of technology in child care;
7270 (9) best practices guidelines based on standards
7371 adopted by nationally recognized organizations, including Head
7472 Start Program Performance Standards, National Health and Safety
7573 Performance Standards, National Association for the Education of
7674 Young Children program standards and accreditation criteria,
7775 National Association for Family Child Care standards, United States
7876 Department of Defense standards, national accreditation standards,
7977 and Texas School Ready! participant standards;
8078 (10) research on infant and toddler brain development;
8179 and
8280 (11) strategies for the long-term financing of the
8381 Texas Rising Star Program, including:
8482 (A) financing the payment of:
8583 (i) incentives to child-care providers
8684 participating in the program; and
8785 (ii) grants and rewards to child-care
8886 providers that achieve and maintain high levels of service; and
8987 (B) strategies to support wage parity for
9088 child-care providers participating in the program.
91- (f) Not later than September 1, 2020, the commission shall
89+ (f) Not later than September 1, 2019, the commission shall
9290 propose rules that incorporate the proposed revisions submitted by
9391 the work group under Subsection (e).
9492 (g) The executive director of the commission shall make the
9593 appointments under this section on September 1, 2019.
9694 (h) This section expires December 1, 2020.
9795 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.