Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3876 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/04/2019

                            86R28751 MCK-F
 By: Deshotel H.B. No. 3876
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3876:
 By:  Romero, Jr. C.S.H.B. No. 3876


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a work group to advise the Texas
 Workforce Commission regarding the Texas Rising Star Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2308.321 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2308.321.  TEXAS RISING STAR PROGRAM REVIEW WORK GROUP.
 (a)  The Texas Rising Star Program review work group is established
 to propose revisions to the commission's rules on the Texas Rising
 Star Program.
 (b)  The work group consists of the following members
 appointed by the executive director of the commission:
 (1)  at least one member from the commission;
 (2)  at least one member from the Health and Human
 Services Commission;
 (3)  at least one member from the early childhood
 education division of the Texas Education Agency;
 (4)  at least one member from the governor's Texas Early
 Learning Council;
 (5)  at least one member who is appointed to a local
 workforce development board;
 (6)  at least four members who are Texas Rising Star
 Program providers with different Texas Rising Star Program ratings:
 (A)  at least one of whom must be a for-profit
 private provider;
 (B)  at least one of whom must be a single-site
 provider;
 (C)  at least one of whom must be a multi-site
 provider; and
 (D)  at least one of whom must be an individual who
 provides child care in the provider's own home;
 (7)  at least one provider who is a Texas School Ready!
 participant;
 (8)  at least three members employed by different
 boards who work in the employing board's child-care program and
 have experience and expertise in early childhood development or the
 Texas Rising Star Program or other similar certification or
 accreditation programs; and
 (9)  not more than three public members who are
 ineligible for appointment to the work group under Subdivisions
 (1)-(8) and whom the executive director considers indispensable to
 work group purposes.
 (c)  The work group shall hold the group's initial meeting
 not later than November 1, 2019, and shall meet at other times as
 determined by the presiding officer.
 (d)  The work group shall elect a presiding officer by a vote
 of the membership of the work group.
 (e)  Not later than May 1, 2020, the work group shall submit
 to the executive director of the commission recommendations
 proposing revisions to the commission's guidelines relating to the
 Texas Rising Star Program.  In making its recommendations, the work
 group shall consider:
 (1)  professional development standards for child-care
 directors and employees, including training and annual
 professional development requirements;
 (2)  education and experience requirements for mentors
 and evaluators;
 (3)  early learning and school readiness standards;
 (4)  guidelines for infants and toddlers in child care;
 (5)  minimum training hours for providers;
 (6)  playground standards, including outdoor learning
 environments;
 (7)  nutrition standards;
 (8)  standards for use of technology in child care;
 (9)  best practices guidelines based on standards
 adopted by nationally recognized organizations, including Head
 Start Program Performance Standards, National Health and Safety
 Performance Standards, National Association for the Education of
 Young Children program standards and accreditation criteria,
 National Association for Family Child Care standards, United States
 Department of Defense standards, national accreditation standards,
 and Texas School Ready! participant standards;
 (10)  research on infant and toddler brain development;
 and
 (11)  strategies for the long-term financing of the
 Texas Rising Star Program, including:
 (A)  financing the payment of:
 (i)  incentives to child-care providers
 participating in the program; and
 (ii)  grants and rewards to child-care
 providers that achieve and maintain high levels of service; and
 (B)  strategies to support wage parity for
 child-care providers participating in the program.
 (f)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the commission shall
 propose rules that incorporate the proposed revisions submitted by
 the work group under Subsection (e).
 (g)  The executive director of the commission shall make the
 appointments under this section on September 1, 2019.
 (h)  This section expires December 1, 2020.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.