House | 05/06/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Filed |