Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 26, 2018

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019