Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB410 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 27, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019