1 | | - | H.B. No. 410 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: White, Bailes H.B. No. 410 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Johnson, Flores, Perry) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 5 | + | Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 6 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 7 | + | May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 410 By: Johnson |
---|
8 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 433.0245, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
| 16 | + | SECTION 1. Section 433.003, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
| 17 | + | amended by adding Subdivisions (1-a), (2-a), (10-a), (11-a), |
---|
| 18 | + | (19-a), (23-a), and (26) to read as follows: |
---|
| 19 | + | (1-a) "Beef" means any edible portion of a formerly |
---|
| 20 | + | live and whole cattle carcass, not derived by synthetic or |
---|
| 21 | + | artificial means. |
---|
| 22 | + | (2-a) "Chicken" means any edible portion of a formerly |
---|
| 23 | + | live and whole chicken carcass, not derived by synthetic or |
---|
| 24 | + | artificial means. |
---|
| 25 | + | (10-a) "Lamb" means any edible portion of a formerly |
---|
| 26 | + | live and whole lamb carcass, not derived by synthetic or artificial |
---|
| 27 | + | means. |
---|
| 28 | + | (11-a) "Meat" means any edible portion of a livestock |
---|
| 29 | + | carcass that does not contain lab-grown, cell cultured, insect, or |
---|
| 30 | + | plant-based products. |
---|
| 31 | + | (19-a) "Pork" means any edible portion of a formerly |
---|
| 32 | + | live and whole swine carcass, not derived by synthetic or |
---|
| 33 | + | artificial means. |
---|
| 34 | + | (23-a) "Rabbit" means any edible portion of a formerly |
---|
| 35 | + | live and whole rabbit, not derived by synthetic or artificial |
---|
| 36 | + | means. |
---|
| 37 | + | (26) "Turkey" means any edible portion of a formerly |
---|
| 38 | + | live and whole turkey carcass, not derived by synthetic or |
---|
| 39 | + | artificial means. |
---|
| 40 | + | SECTION 2. Section 433.005, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
| 41 | + | amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
| 42 | + | (a-1) A food product is misbranded if: |
---|
| 43 | + | (1) the food product is misrepresented as harvested |
---|
| 44 | + | meat through the use of false or misleading advertising or |
---|
| 45 | + | labeling; or |
---|
| 46 | + | (2) any part of the food product's labeling includes |
---|
| 47 | + | the terms "meat," "beef," "chicken," "pork," "turkey," "lamb," |
---|
| 48 | + | "rabbit," or any common variation of those terms and the product |
---|
| 49 | + | does not contain the product described by the term listed on the |
---|
| 50 | + | label. |
---|
| 51 | + | SECTION 3. Section 433.0245, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
9 | 52 | | amended by adding Subsections (a-1), (e), and (f) and amending |
---|
10 | 53 | | Subsections (b), (c), and (d) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 54 | | (a-1) For purposes of this section, a low-volume livestock |
---|
12 | 55 | | processing establishment: |
---|
13 | 56 | | (1) includes an establishment that processes fewer |
---|
14 | 57 | | than 10,000 domestic rabbits or more than 1,000 but fewer than |
---|
15 | 58 | | 10,000 poultry in a calendar year; and |
---|
16 | 59 | | (2) does not include an establishment that processes |
---|
17 | 60 | | 1,000 or fewer poultry raised by the operator of the establishment |
---|
18 | 61 | | in a calendar year. |
---|
19 | 62 | | (b) Except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), a [A] |
---|
20 | 63 | | low-volume livestock processing establishment that is exempt from |
---|
21 | 64 | | federal inspection shall register with the department in accordance |
---|
22 | 65 | | with rules adopted by the executive commissioner for registration. |
---|
23 | 66 | | (c) Except as provided by Subsections (e) and (f), a [A] |
---|
24 | 67 | | low-volume livestock processing establishment that is exempt from |
---|
25 | 68 | | federal inspection shall develop a sanitary operation procedures |
---|
26 | 69 | | plan. |
---|
27 | 70 | | (d) Except as provided by Subsection (f), if [If] |
---|
28 | 71 | | contaminated livestock can be reasonably traced to a low-volume |
---|
29 | 72 | | livestock processing establishment that is exempt from federal |
---|
30 | 73 | | inspection, the department may request the attorney general or the |
---|
31 | 74 | | district or county attorney in the jurisdiction where the facility |
---|
32 | 75 | | is located to institute a civil suit to enjoin the operation of the |
---|
33 | 76 | | establishment until the department determines that the |
---|
34 | 77 | | establishment has been sanitized and is operating safely. |
---|
35 | 78 | | (e) A low-volume livestock processing establishment that is |
---|
36 | 79 | | exempt from federal inspection and processes fewer than 500 |
---|
37 | 80 | | domestic rabbits in a calendar year is not required to comply with |
---|
38 | 81 | | Subsection (b) or (c). |
---|
39 | 82 | | (f) An establishment described by Subsection (a-1)(2): |
---|
40 | 83 | | (1) is not subject to additional state regulation; and |
---|
41 | | - | (2) may sell poultry products directly to consumers. |
---|
42 | | - | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 410 was passed by the House on April |
---|
46 | | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
47 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
48 | | - | H.B. No. 410 on May 23, 2019, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
49 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
50 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
51 | | - | on H.B. No. 410 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, |
---|
52 | | - | Nays 2, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
55 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 410 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
56 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
57 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
58 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
59 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
60 | | - | 410 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
61 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
62 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
63 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Date |
---|
65 | | - | __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 84 | + | (2) may sell poultry products directly to: |
---|
| 85 | + | (A) consumers; and |
---|
| 86 | + | (B) restaurants that provide food for immediate |
---|
| 87 | + | human consumption. |
---|
| 88 | + | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
| 89 | + | * * * * * |
---|