Senate | 05/15/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Co-sponsor authorized | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Record vote RV#1220 | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 05/09/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 3-Muñoz | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amended 2-Pacheco | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Amendment withdrawn 1-Muñoz | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Postponed 5/8/19 6:00 PM | ||
House | 05/07/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed |