Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4293 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/24/2019

                            86R25793 SLB-D
 By: Paul, Phelan, Deshotel H.B. No. 4293
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 4293:
 By:  Metcalf C.S.H.B. No. 4293


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the maintenance and operation of certain projects by
 certain drainage districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 34, Acts of the 57th Legislature, 3rd
 Called Session, 1962, is amended by adding Section 19 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 19.  (a)  The District may enter into a project
 partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers for a project proposed to be located in the District and
 listed in the Sabine Pass to Galveston Bay Texas Coastal Storm Risk
 Management and Ecosystem Restoration report published by the United
 States Army Corps of Engineers in May 2017. If the District enters
 into a project partnership agreement under this subsection, the
 District:
 (1)  must:
 (A)  develop a maintenance and operation plan for
 the proposed project; and
 (B)  biennially submit a report to the General
 Land Office and the legislature on expenditures of state money
 relating to a project described by this subsection; and
 (2)  may enter into an agreement:
 (A)  for a public-private partnership to fund a
 local share of or the costs of the operation and maintenance of a
 project described by this subsection; or
 (B)  with the General Land Office to obtain
 funding for a local match requirement or the operation and
 maintenance of a project described by this subsection.
 (a-1)  If the District enters into a project partnership
 agreement under this section before November 1, 2020, the initial
 report described by Subsection (a)(1)(B) of this section must be
 submitted not later than December 1, 2020. This subsection expires
 January 1, 2021.
 (b)  If a project described by Subsection (a) of this section
 is built in the District, the District may accept money from any
 source to:
 (1)  fund the maintenance and operation of the project;
 and
 (2)  provide local matching funds required by the
 project partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 307, Acts of the 58th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1963, is amended by adding Section 20 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 20.  (a)  The District may enter into a project
 partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers for a project proposed to be located in the District and
 listed in the Sabine Pass to Galveston Bay Texas Coastal Storm Risk
 Management and Ecosystem Restoration report published by the United
 States Army Corps of Engineers in May 2017. If the District enters
 into a project partnership agreement under this subsection, the
 District:
 (1)  must:
 (A)  develop a maintenance and operation plan for
 the proposed project; and
 (B)  biennially submit a report to the General
 Land Office and the legislature on expenditures of state money
 relating to a project described by this subsection; and
 (2)  may enter into an agreement:
 (A)  for a public-private partnership to fund a
 local share of or the costs of the operation and maintenance of a
 project described by this subsection; or
 (B)  with the General Land Office to obtain
 funding for a local match requirement or the operation and
 maintenance of a project described by this subsection.
 (a-1)  If the District enters into a project partnership
 agreement under this section before November 1, 2020, the initial
 report described by Subsection (a)(1)(B) of this section must be
 submitted not later than December 1, 2020. This subsection expires
 January 1, 2021.
 (b)  If a project described by Subsection (a) of this section
 is built in the District, the District may accept money from any
 source to:
 (1)  fund the maintenance and operation of the project;
 and
 (2)  provide local matching funds required by the
 project partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 44, Acts of the 57th Legislature, 3rd
 Called Session, 1962, is amended by adding Section 14 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 14.  (a)  The District may enter into a project
 partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers for a project proposed to be located in the District and
 listed in the Sabine Pass to Galveston Bay Texas Coastal Storm Risk
 Management and Ecosystem Restoration report published by the United
 States Army Corps of Engineers in May 2017. If the District enters
 into a project partnership agreement under this subsection, the
 District:
 (1)  must:
 (A)  develop a maintenance and operation plan for
 the proposed project; and
 (B)  biennially submit a report to the General
 Land Office and the legislature on expenditures of state money
 relating to a project described by this subsection; and
 (2)  may enter into an agreement:
 (A)  for a public-private partnership to fund a
 local share of or the costs of the operation and maintenance of a
 project described by this subsection; or
 (B)  with the General Land Office to obtain
 funding for a local match requirement or the operation and
 maintenance of a project described by this subsection.
 (a-1)  If the District enters into a project partnership
 agreement under this section before November 1, 2020, the initial
 report described by Subsection (a)(1)(B) of this section must be
 submitted not later than December 1, 2020. This subsection expires
 January 1, 2021.
 (b)  If a project described by Subsection (a) of this section
 is built in the District, the District may accept money from any
 source to:
 (1)  fund the maintenance and operation of the project;
 and
 (2)  provide local matching funds required by the
 project partnership agreement with the United States Army Corps of
 Engineers.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.