Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4342 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4342
1+By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 4342
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
3+ May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Texas
612 School Safety Center.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Sections 37.203(a) and (b), Education Code, are
915 amended to read as follows:
1016 (a) The center is advised by a board of directors composed
1117 of:
1218 (1) the attorney general, or the attorney general's
1319 designee;
1420 (2) the commissioner, or the commissioner's designee;
1521 (3) the executive director of the Texas Juvenile
1622 Justice Department, or the executive director's designee;
1723 (4) the commissioner of the Department of State Health
1824 Services, or the commissioner's designee;
1925 (5) the commissioner of higher education, or the
2026 commissioner's designee; and
2127 (6) the following members appointed by the governor
2228 with the advice and consent of the senate:
2329 (A) a juvenile court judge;
2430 (B) a member of a school district's board of
2531 trustees;
2632 (C) an administrator of a public primary school;
2733 (D) an administrator of a public secondary
2834 school;
2935 (E) a member of the state parent-teacher
3036 association;
3137 (F) a teacher from a public primary or secondary
3238 school;
3339 (G) a public school superintendent who is a
3440 member of the Texas Association of School Administrators;
3541 (H) a school district police officer or a peace
3642 officer whose primary duty consists of working in a public school;
3743 [and]
3844 (I) a professional architect who is registered in
3945 this state and a member of the Texas Society of Architects; and
4046 (J) three [two] members of the public.
4147 (b) Members of the board appointed under Subsection (a)(6)
4248 serve staggered two-year terms, with the terms of the members
4349 described by Subsections (a)(6)(A)-(F) [(a)(6)(A)-(E)] expiring on
4450 February 1 of each odd-numbered year and the terms of the members
4551 described by Subsections (a)(6)(G)-(J) [(a)(6)(F)-(I)] expiring on
4652 February 1 of each even-numbered year. A member may serve more than
4753 one term.
4854 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than February 1, 2020, the
4955 governor shall appoint new members to the board of directors of the
5056 Texas School Safety Center as required by Section 37.203(a)(6)(I),
5157 Education Code, as amended by this Act, and Section
5258 37.203(a)(6)(J), Education Code, as added by this Act.
5359 (b) Section 37.203, Education Code, as amended by this Act,
5460 does not affect the term of the member appointed under Section
5561 37.203(a)(6)(F), Education Code, as amended by this Act, and
5662 serving on the board immediately before the effective date of this
5763 Act. After the term of that member expires on February 1, 2020, the
5864 governor shall appoint a member who meets the requirements under
5965 Section 37.203(a)(6)(F), Education Code, as amended by this Act, to
6066 a term expiring February 1, 2021.
6167 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
62- ______________________________ ______________________________
63- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
64- I certify that H.B. No. 4342 was passed by the House on May 3,
65- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not
66- voting.
67- ______________________________
68- Chief Clerk of the House
69- I certify that H.B. No. 4342 was passed by the Senate on May
70- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
71- ______________________________
72- Secretary of the Senate
73- APPROVED: _____________________
74- Date
75- _____________________
76- Governor
68+ * * * * *