H.B. No. 4342 AN ACT relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Texas School Safety Center. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 37.203(a) and (b), Education Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) The center is advised by a board of directors composed of: (1) the attorney general, or the attorney general's designee; (2) the commissioner, or the commissioner's designee; (3) the executive director of the Texas Juvenile Justice Department, or the executive director's designee; (4) the commissioner of the Department of State Health Services, or the commissioner's designee; (5) the commissioner of higher education, or the commissioner's designee; and (6) the following members appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate: (A) a juvenile court judge; (B) a member of a school district's board of trustees; (C) an administrator of a public primary school; (D) an administrator of a public secondary school; (E) a member of the state parent-teacher association; (F) a teacher from a public primary or secondary school; (G) a public school superintendent who is a member of the Texas Association of School Administrators; (H) a school district police officer or a peace officer whose primary duty consists of working in a public school; [and] (I) a professional architect who is registered in this state and a member of the Texas Society of Architects; and (J) three [two] members of the public. (b) Members of the board appointed under Subsection (a)(6) serve staggered two-year terms, with the terms of the members described by Subsections (a)(6)(A)-(F) [(a)(6)(A)-(E)] expiring on February 1 of each odd-numbered year and the terms of the members described by Subsections (a)(6)(G)-(J) [(a)(6)(F)-(I)] expiring on February 1 of each even-numbered year. A member may serve more than one term. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than February 1, 2020, the governor shall appoint new members to the board of directors of the Texas School Safety Center as required by Section 37.203(a)(6)(I), Education Code, as amended by this Act, and Section 37.203(a)(6)(J), Education Code, as added by this Act. (b) Section 37.203, Education Code, as amended by this Act, does not affect the term of the member appointed under Section 37.203(a)(6)(F), Education Code, as amended by this Act, and serving on the board immediately before the effective date of this Act. After the term of that member expires on February 1, 2020, the governor shall appoint a member who meets the requirements under Section 37.203(a)(6)(F), Education Code, as amended by this Act, to a term expiring February 1, 2021. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 4342 was passed by the House on May 3, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 4342 was passed by the Senate on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor