Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4372 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 4372
1+By: Murphy, Parker (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 4372
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019;
3+ May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to youth camp abuse complaints and compliance orders.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Chapter 141, Health and Safety Code, is amended
814 by adding Sections 141.0051 and 141.0085 to read as follows:
915 Sec. 141.0051. LICENSE; CONSIDERATION OF CERTAIN
1016 CONVICTIONS. In making a determination on issuance, renewal, or
1117 revocation of a youth camp operator's license, the department shall
12- consider whether the youth camp employs an individual who was
13- convicted of an act of sexual abuse, as defined by Section 21.02,
14- Penal Code, that occurred at the camp.
18+ consider whether the youth camp employs or formerly employed an
19+ individual who was convicted of an act of sexual abuse, as defined
20+ by Section 21.02, Penal Code, arising from the individual's
21+ employment with the camp.
1522 Sec. 141.0085. REPORTS OF ABUSE; DUTIES OF YOUTH CAMP
1623 OPERATOR. (a) The executive commissioner by rule shall establish a
1724 procedure for the department to forward a report of alleged abuse of
1825 a camper that is received by the department to the Department of
1926 Family and Protective Services or another appropriate agency.
2027 (b) If a law enforcement agency notifies a youth camp
2128 operator of the investigation or conviction of an individual who is
22- employed by the camp for an act of sexual abuse, as defined by
23- Section 21.02, Penal Code, that occurred at the camp, the operator
24- shall:
29+ employed or was formerly employed by the camp for an act of sexual
30+ abuse, as defined by Section 21.02, Penal Code, and the
31+ investigation or conviction arises from the individual's
32+ employment with the camp, the operator shall:
2533 (1) immediately notify the department of the
2634 investigation or conviction; and
2735 (2) retain all records related to the investigation or
2836 conviction until the department notifies the camp that the record
2937 retention is no longer required.
3038 SECTION 2. Chapter 141, Health and Safety Code, is amended
3139 by adding Sections 141.0111 and 141.0112 to read as follows:
32- Sec. 141.0111. REQUIRED INFORMATION ABOUT ABUSE REPORTING.
33- A youth camp operator shall develop and maintain a written policy
34- regarding the method for reporting to the department suspected
35- abuse occurring at the camp. The operator on request of any person
36- shall provide a copy of the policy to the person.
40+ Sec. 141.0111. REQUIRED NOTICE ABOUT ABUSE REPORTING. (a)
41+ A youth camp operator shall provide notice to the public regarding
42+ the method for reporting to the department suspected abuse
43+ occurring at the youth camp. The operator must provide the notice
44+ by:
45+ (1) posting a conspicuous sign in at least one
46+ prominent location at the youth camp that is accessible to the
47+ public;
48+ (2) posting the information on the youth camp's
49+ publicly accessible Internet website; and
50+ (3) on request, making a written copy of the
51+ information available to a person.
52+ (b) The department shall prescribe the content of the notice
53+ required by Subsection (a).
3754 Sec. 141.0112. REQUIRED NOTICE ABOUT YOUTH CAMP COMPLAINTS
3855 AND DISCIPLINARY ACTIONS. (a) The department shall post on the
3956 department's Internet website each youth camp compliance order
4057 issued by the department until at least the third anniversary of the
4158 date the compliance order was finally adjudicated.
4259 (b) A youth camp operator shall include on the camp's
43- publicly accessible Internet website a clearly marked link to the
44- youth camp program web page on the department's Internet website.
45- SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Sections 141.0085, 141.0111,
60+ publicly accessible Internet website a clearly marked direct link
61+ to the web page on the department's Internet website on which the
62+ department posts youth camp compliance orders issued by the
63+ department.
64+ SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2019, the Department
65+ of State Health Services shall prescribe the content of the notice
66+ to the public as required by Section 141.0111, Health and Safety
67+ Code, as added by this Act.
68+ SECTION 4. Notwithstanding Sections 141.0085, 141.0111,
4669 and 141.0112, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a youth
4770 camp operator is not required to comply with those sections until
4871 January 1, 2020.
49- SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
50- ______________________________ ______________________________
51- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
52- I certify that H.B. No. 4372 was passed by the House on May
53- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 7, 2 present, not
54- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
55- No. 4372 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 1,
56- 2 present, not voting.
57- ______________________________
58- Chief Clerk of the House
59- I certify that H.B. No. 4372 was passed by the Senate, with
60- amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
61- 0.
62- ______________________________
63- Secretary of the Senate
64- APPROVED: __________________
65- Date
66- __________________
67- Governor
72+ SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
73+ * * * * *